Ashbougwu v. Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Arthur N Ashbougwu
Defendant: Veteran Benefits Administration and Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 2:2020cv00830
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- Pltf has not paid the filing fee or filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis; He has also failed to correct the deficient pleading; Pltf is ORDERED to show cause on or before August 11, 2020 as to why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/29/20. (MRR, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Duplicate COMPLAINT against Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs, Veteran Benefits Administration, filed by Arthur N Ashbougwu. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(MRR, ) Modified on 6/22/2020 (MRR, ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- The pltf must file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the filing fee within 30 days. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/15/20. (MRR, )
June 11, 2020 MOTION for Emergency Hearing within the body of the Complaint #1 by Arthur N Ashbougwu. (MRR, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs, Veteran Benefits Administration, filed by Arthur N Ashbougwu.(MRR, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #1 Exhibit) (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashbougwu v. Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veteran Benefits Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur N Ashbougwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?