Real Estate & Design Associates LLC v. Altisource Online Auction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Real Estate & Design Associates LLC
Defendant: Altisource Online Auction Inc, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Bank of New York Mellon, The, Westcor Land Title Insurance Company and Altisource Solutions Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00833
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 21 Brief re #19 MOTION to Dismiss , #20 Response in Support of Motion filed by Altisource Online Auction Inc, Altisource Solutions Inc. (Mallette, Greer)
July 21, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss (Documentary Submission In Support Of) filed by Altisource Online Auction Inc, Altisource Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Mallette, Greer)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Altisource Online Auction Inc, Altisource Solutions Inc. (Mallette, Greer)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiff has filed an amended complaint. (Doc. #17 ). That complaint is now the operative pleading in this matter. WestCor is not named as a defendant in the amended complaint. Therefore, WestCor no longer is a party to this action, and WestCor's motion to dismiss is moot. (Doc. #12 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 07/20/2020.(ZTC)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Altisource Online Auction Inc, Altisource Solutions Inc, Bank of New York Mellon, The, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, filed by Real Estate & Design Associates LLC.(Harp, H)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Real Estate & Design Associates LLC (Harp, H)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of New York Mellon, The, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC.(Manley, Reid)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Vincent Ronderos on behalf of Westcor Land Title Insurance Company (Ronderos, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 Brief re #12 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Ejectment Action Docket)(Reeves, T)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Reeves, T)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/13/2020. (KEK)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #8 ). Defendant Westcor Land Title Insurance Company shall respond to the Complaint on or before 7/20/2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/7/2020. (YMB)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendants' motion for extension of time. (Doc. #7 ). Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC shall respond to the Complaint on or before 7/20/2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/7/2020. (YMB)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Reeves, T)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by Bank of New York Mellon, The, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Manley, Reid)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Bank of New York Mellon, The, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC Consent To Removal (Manley, Reid)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendants' motion for extension of time. (Doc. #4 ). THe Altisource Defendants shall please respond to the Complaint on or before 7/20/2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/6/2020. (YMB)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by Altisource Online Auction Inc, Altisource Solutions Inc. (Mallette, Greer)
June 17, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3611773 (ALNd B4601106621) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2020-900448, filed by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - state complaint)(KEK). (Reeves, T) Modified on 6/17/2020 (KEK).
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. filed by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company (Reeves, T)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Evidentiary Material re: #1 Notice of Removal Exhibit 2: Notice of Filing Notice of Removal. (Reeves, T)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2020-900448, filed by Westcor Land Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state complaint)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Real Estate & Design Associates LLC v. Altisource Online Auction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Online Auction Inc
Represented By: Greer B Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westcor Land Title Insurance Company
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Represented By: Joseph Vincent Ronderos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altisource Solutions Inc
Represented By: Greer B Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Real Estate & Design Associates LLC
Represented By: Joseph Charles Somma
Represented By: H Gregory Harp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?