Orr v. General Motors
Plaintiff: Devante Orr
Defendant: General Motors
Case Number: 2:2020cv00878
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for More Definite Statement by General Motors. (Enyinnia, Amaobi)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors. filed by General Motors (Enyinnia, Amaobi)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Devante Orr. General Motors served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (AKD)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to General Motors. Delivered to US Marshals for service. (KEK)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying Mr. Orr's motion for the appointment of an attorney. Despite his pro se status, Mr. Orr must abide by all relevant Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, including those rules requiring him to timely serve process on all named defendants. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Guide) (SRD)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Devante Orr. (KEK)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors, filed by Devante Orr.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr v. General Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors
Represented By: Amaobi Joseph Enyinnia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devante Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?