Jones et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA et al
Plaintiff: Angelo Webster, Clarence Oates, Robert Jones and David Cross
Defendant: Cliffs Mining Services Company Inc, OG Resources Wind Down Co LLC, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA and Sen NA Coal Wind Down Co LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00936
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER CANCELLING consent conference scheduled for 10:30 AM on Wednesday, August 12, 2020. The consent conference will be rescheduled in the event all parties make an appearance prior to the consent deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 08/12/2020. (Borden, Gray)
August 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE to remind parties of consent conference scheduled at 10:30 AM on Wednesday, August 12, 2020; if all parties submit an executed consent form, either consenting or declining magistrate judge jurisdiction, the conference will be canceled (ASL)
August 6, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Dodson, John)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Cross, Robert Jones, Clarence Oates, Angelo Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sellers v. Nationwide (ND Ala), #2 Exhibit Plan Admin v. Gail Rice (ED Mich), #3 Exhibit 11 ST. JOHNS BANKR. RESEARCH LIBR. NO. 19 (2019))(Leonard, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 8/31/2020 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge; Telephone Conference set for 8/12/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden; parties are DIRECTED to dial 866-390-1828 no less than five minutes before the status conference begins. The access code is 9262283; The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if all parties submit forms 24 hours in advance.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/16/2020. (KAM)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER re #9 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA 's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion on or before 7/30/2020, and Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA may file a reply on or before 8/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/16/2020. (KMAW)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Dodson, John)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Cliffs Mining Services Company Inc.(Ragsdale, Barry)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cliffs Mining Services Company Inc. filed by Cliffs Mining Services Company Inc (Ragsdale, Barry)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL (KAM)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The #4 National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED to file its responsive pleading on or before 7/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 7/2/2020. (KMAW)
July 2, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3622525. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-901949, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - state complaint, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(KEK). (Dodson, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Dodson, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (KEK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 01-cv-2020-901949, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - state complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Webster
Represented By: Robert Edward LeMoine
Represented By: Douglas Brett Turnbull
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Oates
Represented By: Robert Edward LeMoine
Represented By: Douglas Brett Turnbull
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones
Represented By: Robert Edward LeMoine
Represented By: Douglas Brett Turnbull
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cross
Represented By: Robert Edward LeMoine
Represented By: Douglas Brett Turnbull
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliffs Mining Services Company Inc
Represented By: Barry A Ragsdale
Represented By: Meghan Salvati Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OG Resources Wind Down Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Represented By: John W Dodson
Represented By: Michelle L Crunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sen NA Coal Wind Down Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?