Stallings v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Christy Stallings
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00944
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER-The Court GRANTS Defendant Lowes Home Centers, LLCs motion for entry of a HIPAA protective order. #7 . Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 08/05/2020. (AKD)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Hipaa Order by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Stott, Joseph)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Stott, Joseph)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/15/2020. (KSS)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL- Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020. Pretrial Conference on 12/2/2021 at 1:30a.m; Jury Trial set for 1/10/2022 at 09:00 AM BOTH at Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 07/10/2020. (AKD)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Stott, Joseph)
July 6, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3623582 (ALND receipt# B4601106949). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, case number 01-CV-2020-902184.00., filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A-Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B)(AKD). (Stott, Joseph) Modified on 7/6/2020 (AKD)
July 3, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure by Lowe's Home Centers LLC (AKD)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers LLC from Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, case number 01-CV-2020-902184.00., filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2, #3 Exhibit B)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallings v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Stallings
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?