Williams v. Belk Inc
Plaintiff: Lafeathura M Williams
Defendant: Belk Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00949
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Letter of Remand to Jefferson County Circuit Court (AKD)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REMANDING CASE-Because federal courts are courts oflimited jurisdiction, and the amount in controversy is not satisfied based on the complaint and Williams description of her actual losses in the demand letter, this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Jefferson County. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 07/28/2020. (AKD)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 7/15/2020. (KSS)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL- Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 02:30 PM and Jury Trial set for 1/10/2022 09:00 a.m. BOTH at Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 07/10/2020. (AKD)
July 8, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601107011 (AKD)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure by Belk Inc (AKD)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Belk Inc.(AKD)
July 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Belk Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County Alabama, case number 01-CV-2020-902325.00. (), filed by Belk Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Removal)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Belk Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belk Inc
Represented By: Glenn E Ireland
Represented By: Virginia F Gambacurta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafeathura M Williams
Represented By: Thomas Johnson Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?