Romero v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John M Romero
Defendant: Unum Group and Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01002
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for September 23, 2020 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT -The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:20 CV 1002 AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company. filed by Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company (Morrissette, Henry)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 08/25/2020. (AKD)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than October 8, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after October 8, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for September 23, 2020 at 2:15 p.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 08/25/2020. (AKD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company.(Morrissette, Henry)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unum Group, filed by John M Romero.(Burke, Peter)
July 22, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3634043 (ALND receipt# B4601107292). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Unum Group, filed by John M Romero.(AKD). (Burke, Peter) Modified on 7/22/2020 (AKD).
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Group, filed by John M Romero.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Henry Tonsmeire Morrissette
Represented By: John S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M Romero
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?