SJP Investment Partners LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: SJP Investment Partners LLC
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 2:2020cv01033
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is Plaintiffs Motion for Leave for Late Payment of Pro Hac Vice Fee for Attorney Shannon Loyd. #19 The Motion #19 is GRANTED. Attorney Loyd is accordingly granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/24/2020. (KAM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for leave for late payment of Pro Hac Vice Fee by SJP Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loyd, Shannon)
August 21, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3655613. (Loyd, Shannon)
August 20, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601107903 for Bruce Steckler (KAM)
August 20, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $75, receipt number B4601107902 for Michael Steinmark (KAM)
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by SJP Investment Partners LLC re 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,, Certification Related to Conditional Pro Hac Vice Admission (Steinmark, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER - The court conducted a telephone conference with counsel for the parties on August 19, 2020. As a result of the discussions during the conference, this case is STAYED pending a ruling by the JPML. Additionally, because Plaintiff amended his Complaint once as a matter of course #16 , Defendants Motion to Dismiss #5 is no longer directed at the operative Complaint. The court thus DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE Defendants Motion to Dismiss #5 as it is no longer directed at the operative Complaint. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/20/2020. (KAM)
August 19, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 8/19/2020. The court will enter an order continuing the stay as discussed. (KLL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cincinnati Insurance Company, The, filed by SJP Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Templeton, Spenser)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff filed a Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Michael R. Steinmark, Bruce K. Steckler, and Shannon E. Loyd #14 . The Motion #14 is CONDITIONALLY GRANTED. On or before August 20, 2020, Attorney Steinmark, Attorney Steckler, and Attorney Loyd SHALL pay the PHV fee and certify to the court that they have read and understand: (a) any local rules applicable in this District; (b) the Alabama State Bar Code of Professional Courtesy and the Lawyers Creed, which can be accessed at: https://www.alabar.org/membership/code-of-professional-courtesy/, https://www.alabar.org/membership/lawyers-creed/; and (c) this courts CM/ECF requirements. Failure to submit the above items will result in vacatur of the conditional grant of the motion. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/13/2020. (KAM)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SJP Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Bruce W. Steckler, #2 Affidavit of Michael R. Steinmark, #3 Affidavit of Shannon E. Loyd)(Templeton, Spenser)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER - This case is before the court on Defendants Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael P. Baniak and Attorney Daniel G. Litchfield #11 #12 . The Motions #11 #12 are GRANTED. Attorney Baniak and Attorney Litchfield are granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/6/2020. (KAM)
August 6, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3644875. (R# B4601107580) (Dowd, Augusta)
August 6, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3644869.(R# B4601107579) (Dowd, Augusta)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dowd, Augusta)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Dowd, Augusta)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER - This case is before the court on the parties Joint Motion to Extend and Set Initial Deadlines #9 . The Motion is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss or file an Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to August 19, 2020. Further, this case is SET for a telephone conference on August 19, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. The parties are DIRECTED to dial-in to the conference by calling 866-434-5269, using access code 6022965 at the scheduled time. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/5/2020. (KAM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time and Set Initial Deadlines by SJP Investment Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Templeton, Spenser)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The (Dowd, Augusta)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - This case is before the court Defendants Motion to Dismiss #5 . The parties are DIRECTED to brief the Motion #5 in accordance with Exhibit B of the courts Initial Order #2 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/29/2020. (KAM)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - This case is before the court on Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint #4 . For good cause shown, the Motion #4 is GRANTED. Defendant SHALL respond to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before August 18, 2020. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/29/2020. (KAM)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gavrilides v Michigan Ins Order and Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - CDC Guidance Cleaning and Disinfecting, #3 Exhibit C - EPA List of Covid Disinfectants, #4 Exhibit D - Social Life v Sentinel Transcript, #5 Exhibit E - SJP Policy Excerpts)(Dowd, Augusta)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Dowd, Augusta)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Chambers Waller, IV on behalf of Cincinnati Insurance Company, The (Waller, William)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/23/2020. (KEK)
July 21, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3633745. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-092268. (), filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Notice, # 3 RFP, # 4 Notice, # 5 Summons, # 6 Certified mail notice, # 7 Green card, # 8 Notice)(KAM). (Dowd, Augusta) NDAL rec# B4601107289 Modified on 7/22/2020 (KAM, ).
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2020-092268. (), filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice, #3 RFP, #4 Notice, #5 Summons, #6 Certified mail notice, #7 Green card, #8 Notice)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SJP Investment Partners LLC v. Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJP Investment Partners LLC
Represented By: Garrick L Stotser
Represented By: Spenser Templeton
Represented By: Michael Robert Steinmark
Represented By: Bruce William Steckler
Represented By: Shannon E. Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Craig A. Shirley
Represented By: Augusta S Dowd
Represented By: Daniel G Litchfield
Represented By: William Chambers Waller, IV
Represented By: Michael P Baniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?