Cleland v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Evette Cleland
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01112
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER IN ERISA BENEFITS CASES - with appendices attached. The parties SHALL file a joint report, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) on or before November 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/23/20. (SAC)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's #5 motion for an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Defendant must file its responsive pleading on or before September 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/1/2020. (RLW)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America. filed by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Evette Cleland. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (KEK)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Evette Cleland. (Burke, Peter)
August 5, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3643840. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Evette Cleland.(KEK). (Burke, Peter) (ALND R# B4601107545) Modified on 8/5/2020 (MEB2).
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Evette Cleland.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleland v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evette Cleland
Represented By: Peter H Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?