Hogg v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Juanita S Hogg
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01130
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Northern District of California. (AKD)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (MEB2)
August 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3648043 (ALND receipt# B4601107725). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Juanita S Hogg.(AKD). (DiLorenzo, Joel) Modified on 8/11/2020 (AKD).
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Juanita S Hogg.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hogg v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita S Hogg
Represented By: Joel Lee DiLorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?