Lee v. Givens
Plaintiff: Markus Dawayne Lee
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Case Number: 2:2020cv01187
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the court having received prisoner consent form the Warden is directed to deduct Monthly Payments from Prison Account of MARKUS DAWAYNE LEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/25/2020. (PSM)
September 22, 2020 Filing fee: $ 10.51, receipt number B4601108574 (PSM)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Markus Dawayne Lee (MEB2)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER terming motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/1/2020. (PSM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Markus Dawayne Lee. (KEK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gwendolyn Givens, filed by Markus Dawayne Lee.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Dawayne Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?