Wilson v. State of Alabama et al
Petitioner: Antwone Lonezo Wilson
Respondent: State of Alabama and Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Case Number: 2:2020cv01191
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Order #9 filed by Antwone Lonezo Wilson. (MRR, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 Legal Arguments- Correction to Last Motion by Antwone Lonezo Wilson (MRR, )
September 30, 2020 MOTION of respondents treating answer (Doc 8) as a MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT pursuant to order (Doc 9) (MRR, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER- The undersigned deems the case ripe for summary disposition under Rule 8(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases on the basis of the defenses asserted in the respondents' answer; Petitioner shall have twenty calendar (20) days to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments he may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/30/20. (MRR, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 Respondents's ANSWER to Complaint by Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, State of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Davis, John)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John J Davis on behalf of Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The, State of Alabama (Davis, John)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Respondents are ORDERED to appear and SHOW CAUSE within twenty (20) days why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/9/20. (MRR, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER- The petitioner has paid the $5.00 filing fee; The in forma pauperis motions (Docs #2 & #4 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 9/9/20. (MRR, )
September 4, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B4601108233 (MRR, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antwone Lonezo Wilson. (MEB2)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING- Petitioner must either file a new application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the $5.00 filing fee within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/26/20. (MRR, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antwone Lonezo Wilson. (MEB2)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Antwone Lonezo Wilson.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. State of Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alabama
Represented By: John J Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Alabama, The
Represented By: John J Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antwone Lonezo Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?