Haywood v. United of Omaha Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Donnie Haywood
Defendant: Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC and United of Omaha Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01195
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by United of Omaha Insurance Company.(Johnson, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(Pennington, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted (not deliverable as addressed unable to forward) by Donnie Haywood as to Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC. (MEB2)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
August 20, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3654351 (ALND R# B4601107896) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(KAM). (Pennington, John) Modified on 8/20/2020 (MEB2).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Donnie Haywood. (KAM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC, United of Omaha Insurance Company, filed by Donnie Haywood.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haywood v. United of Omaha Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Haywood
Represented By: John M Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens Pipe & Steel LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Insurance Company
Represented By: John S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?