Brown v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Carnetta Brown
Defendant: Travelers Home, The, Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Counter Defendant: Anthony Gibbs, Terry Jackson, Eric Brown, III, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA and Ladarrius Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv01208
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. Carnetta Brown served on 10/13/2020 (no date on green card), answer due 11/3/2020. (MRR, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (MRR, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 Counter-Claim Summons Issued as to Carnetta Brown(By and through as personal representative of the Estate of Louise Holman), sent via certified mail (MRR, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 18 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.-As to Anthony Gibbs (MRR, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. Eric Brown, III served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020; Ladarrius Brown served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (MRR, ) Modified to add the correct scanned image of returns. Green card for Anthony Gibbs previously attached in error 10/9/2020 (MRR, ).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER REVISING SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendants shall have a maximum of four depositions in addition to the parties and their experts and Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff shall have a maximum of four depositions in addition to the parties and their experts. This Revised Scheduling Order corrects an inadvertent omission by the court and makes the Scheduling Order consistent with the agreement of the parties as reflected in their Rule 26(f) report. All other deadlines set out in the court's Scheduling Order entered on September 25, 2020 (doc. 13), remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 10/6/2020. (FNC)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Estate of Louise Holman's Answer to #11 Counterclaims filed by Carnetta Brown, Carnetta Brown, Eric Brown, III, Ladarrius Brown, Anthony Gibbs, Terry Jackson. (Roberts, James) Modified text on 10/5/2020 (MRR, ).
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Eric Brown, III, Ladarrius Brown, Anthony Gibbs, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, Terry Jackson. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER- Certain deadlines and instructions apply as further set out within including: Discovery due by 7/13/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2021, Trial ready December 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 21, 2021. A Status Conference is set for Monday, June 28, 2021 at 11:00 AM by Zoom. The court will provide the participating information to the parties by email, one week prior to the conference. This order governs further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 9/25/20. (MRR, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Newton, Candace)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Carnetta Brown, Carnetta Brown, Eric Brown, III, Ladarrius Brown, Anthony Gibbs, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, Terry Jackson by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Newton, Candace)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carnetta Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Travelers)(Roberts, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carnetta Brown. JP Morgan Chase Bank NA served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (MRR, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices I, II, and III attached. This order governs all further proceedings in this court. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/28/20. (MRR, )
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- The court's independent review of the complaint reveals that is is an impermissible shotgun pleading; The court STRIKES the complaint and ORDERS pltf to replead on or before September 9, 2020 in conformity with FRCP 8(a)(2) and 10(b), as well as the Eleventh Circuit's instructions about properly pleading a complaint; The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company may reassert its counterclaims, if any, in its response to pltf's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 8/27/20. (MRR, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to JP Morgan Chase Bank NA. Mailed certified mail (MEB2)
August 20, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601107898 (MRR, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 Supplement to Notice of Removal #1 by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Supplement to Notice of Removal)(Isenberg, Joel) Modified on 8/21/2020 (FNC). Doc filed as motion. Not a motion, just a supplement to Removal.
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The (Isenberg, Joel) Modified on 8/20/2020 (MRR, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The (MRR, ) Modified on 8/20/2020 (MRR, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Carnetta Brown, Carnetta Brown by and through as personal representative of the Estate of Louise Holman, Eric Brown, III, Ladarrius Brown, Anthony Gibbs, JP Morgan Chase Bank NA, Terry Jackson by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ) Modified on 8/20/2020 (MRR, ).
August 19, 2020 *STRICKEN* COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carnetta Brown.- Deemed filed 7/21/20, Circuit Court of Jefferson County (Doc 1-1 p 7 of combined pdf)(MRR, ) **STRICKEN pursuant to Order Doc 7** 8/27/2020 (MRR, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, case number 01-cv-2020-902613., filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(MRR, ) Modified on 8/20/2020 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home, The
Represented By: Candace H Newton
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Candace H Newton
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Candace H Newton
Represented By: Joel S Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anthony Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Terry Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Eric Brown, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ladarrius Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnetta Brown
Represented By: James S Roberts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?