Shaffer v. Bridgeway Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hollis Shaffer
Defendant: Bridgeway Services LLC and Kerry Mataya
Case Number: 2:2020cv01361
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John H England, III: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2020; Attorney P. Evans present by phone for the plaintiff; Attorneys M. Boardman and M. Turner present by phone for the dfts; consent process discussed; conf adj. (AVC)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/09/2020. (AKD)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 23, 2020. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after November 23, 2020. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for November 9, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/09/2020. (AKD)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bridgeway Services LLC, Kerry Mataya.(Boardman, Mark)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Hollis Shaffer for defendant Kerry Mataya. (AKD)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bridgeway Services LLC and Kerry Mataya mailed certified mail. (AKD)
September 15, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3671548 (ALND receipt# B4601108445). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Bridgeway Services LLC, Kerry Mataya, filed by Hollis Shaffer.(AKD). (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 9/15/2020 (AKD).
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action (AKD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Hollis Shaffer. (AKD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bridgeway Services LLC, Kerry Mataya, filed by Hollis Shaffer.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer v. Bridgeway Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollis Shaffer
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgeway Services LLC
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Mataya
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?