Jaimes v. Penn Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Liborio Jaimes
Defendant: Fulton Hills II Inc, Penn Properties Inc, Lance Rushing, 1815 Investments LLC, 1815 Management Company LLC, Penn Construction Inc, Fulton Hills Inc and Lewis Rushing
Case Number: 2:2020cv01423
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Liborio Jaimes. filed by Liborio Jaimes (Yearout, Jason)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Mr. Jaimes served 1815 Investments LLC (doc. #5 ), 1815 Management Company LLC (doc. #6 ), Fulton Hills Inc. (doc. #11 ), and Fulton Hills II Inc. (doc. #12 ) on October 1, 2020. Responsive pleadings were due by October 22, 2020, but none of these defendants have filed an answer or any other pleading. As a result, the court ORDERS Mr. Jaimes to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before November 18, 2020, why the court should not dismiss 1815 Investments LLC, 1815 Management Company LLC, Fulton Hills Inc., and Fulton Hills II Inc. for Mr. Jaimes' failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/10/2020. (KEK)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/20/20. (SAC)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Penn Construction Inc, Penn Properties Inc, Lance Rushing, Lewis Rushing.(Nelson, Roderick)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. Fulton Hills II Inc served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. Fulton Hills Inc served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. Penn Properties Inc served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. Penn Construction Inc served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. Lewis Rushing served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. Lance Rushing served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. 1815 Management Company LLC served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liborio Jaimes. 1815 Investments LLC served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Rubio, Sigfredo)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lance Rushing. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 1815 Investments LLC, 1815 Management Company LLC, Fulton Hills II Inc, Fulton Hills Inc, Penn Construction Inc, Penn Properties Inc, Lewis Rushing. Returned to Plaintiff for service. (KEK)
September 30, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601108748. (KEK)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Liborio Jaimes.(Rubio, Sigfredo) Modified on 9/25/2020 (KEK).
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1815 Investments LLC, 1815 Management Company LLC, Fulton Hills II Inc, Fulton Hills Inc, Penn Construction Inc, Penn Properties Inc, Lance Rushing, Lewis Rushing, filed by Liborio Jaimes.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaimes v. Penn Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Hills II Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Properties Inc
Represented By: Roderick K Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Rushing
Represented By: Roderick K Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1815 Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1815 Management Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Construction Inc
Represented By: Roderick K Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Hills Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Rushing
Represented By: Roderick K Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liborio Jaimes
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Jason L Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?