Bennett v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Annette Bennett
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv01431
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Annette Bennett. United States of America served on 11/6/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (MRR, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to US Marshals for service (MRR, )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- Ms. Bennett's motion (Doc #2 )to commence a suit without prepayment of fees, costs, or security is GRANTED, and her motion for the court to request that an attorney represent her is DENIED. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 10/8/20. (MRR, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Evidentiary Material. filed by Annette Bennett (Attachments: #1 Redacted Exhibits)(MRR, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- Annette Bennett's September 28, 2020 filing contains unredacted personal information; The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal the exhibit to the filing (Doc #3 -1). Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 9/29/20. (MRR, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Evidentiary Material. filed by Annette Bennett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(MRR, ) Sealed Exhibit pursuant to Order Doc 4 on 9/30/2020 (MRR, ).
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Annette Bennett. (MRR, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Annette Bennett.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?