Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC v. Paradigm Laboratories LLC
Petitioner: Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC
Respondent: Paradigm Laboratories LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01567
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has informed the court that this case has settled. Accordingly, Plaintiff is relieved of its obligation to show cause pursuant to the previous order. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a status report regarding the settlement by December 20, 2020, unless this case has been dismissed prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 11/20/2020. (CDG)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to re #6 Order to Show Cause filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC. (LeMoine, Robert)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-It has come to the undersigneds attention that more than twenty-one days have elapsed since Defendant Paradigm Laboratories, LLC was served with the summons and complaint, that said defendant has failed to answer or otherwise respond, and that the plaintiff has failed to seek default judgment. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/09/2020. (AKD)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC. Paradigm Laboratories LLC served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. (AKD)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Paradigm Laboratories LLC mailed certified mail. (AKD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC. (AKD)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paradigm Laboratories LLC, filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC.(AKD)
October 7, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3689021 (ALND receipt# B4601108951). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Paradigm Laboratories LLC, filed by Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC.(AKD). (LeMoine, Robert) Modified on 10/7/2020 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC v. Paradigm Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paradigm Laboratories LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Assurance Scientific Laboratories LLC
Represented By: Robert Edward LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?