Anderson v. Subaru of America, Inc., etc. et al
Plaintiff: Roman Anderson
Defendant: Denso International America Inc, Subaru Corp., Denso Corp. and Subaru of America Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01587
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS (35) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 2:20-cv-00563-ACA; GRANTS (39) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 2:20-cv-01587-ACA. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/13/20. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA (SAC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Lydia K. Reynolds by Roman Anderson, Chiara Bancod-Hile, Mark Gardner, Katherine Griffin, Robert Karrat, Janet Oakley, David Sroelov, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(Barnett, Henry)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS (33) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Courtney L. Davenport in case 2:20-cv-00563-ACA; GRANTS (37) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Courtney L. Davenport in case 2:20-cv-01587-ACA. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 11/12/20. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(SAC)
November 12, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV for Courtney L. Davenport by Roman Anderson, Chiara Bancod-Hile, Mark Gardner, Katherine Griffin, Robert Karrat, Janet Oakley, David Sroelov, Adam Whitley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(Barnett, Henry)
November 12, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3714592. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(Reynolds, Lydia)
November 12, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3714259. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(Davenport, Courtney)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - The court finds that the above-styled actions involve sufficient common questions of law and fact to warrant consolidation. Thus, the court CONSOLIDATES these matters for purposes of discovery, pretrial proceedings, and trial. Going forward, the court DIRECTS the parties to file all documents under case number 2:20-cv-00563-ACA and to use the style that appears in this order. Further, the court DIRECTS Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint that includes all allegations and claims by November 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/19/2020. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-00563-ACA, 2:20-cv-01587-ACA(KEK)
October 9, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of Hawaii; Case Number 1:20-cv-00290. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ROMAN ANDERSON'S MOTION TO TRANSFER (ECF No. #20 ) - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 10/8/2020. Plaintiff's unopposed MOTION TO TRANSFER (ECF No. #20 ) to the United States District Court, Northern District of Alabama is GRANTED. All pending deadlines are hereby vacated and to be reset by the District Court in the Northern District of Alabama. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to TRANSFER the case and all files here to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 33 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 is CONTINUED to 12/15/2020 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (agh) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO TRANSFER by Subaru of America, Inc. re #20 MOTION TO TRANSFER Subaru of America, Inc.. (Matayoshi, Jerold) Docket Text Modified on 8/27/2020 (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerold T. Matayoshi on behalf of Subaru of America, Inc. (Matayoshi, Jerold) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 30 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #20 MOTION to Transfer filed by Denso International America, Inc.. (Lam, Michael) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Lam on behalf of Denso International America, Inc. (Lam, Michael) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 28 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2020 is CONTINUED to 10/06/2020 at 9:45 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(mrf) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST Request for a Conference Call by Roman Anderson. (Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roman Anderson re #23 Link,,,, Add and Terminate Parties,,, (Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Roman Anderson re #22 Link,,,, (Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Anderson. Subaru of America, Inc. served on 7/9/2020. (Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 23 EO: On July 28, 2020, Plaintiff filed:PLAINTIFF ROMAN ANDERSON'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS SUBARU CORPORATION AND DENSO CORPORATION (ECF Nos. #18 and #19 ).Defendant Subaru Corporation and Defendant Denso Corporation have not appeared. Defendant Subaru Corporation and Defendant Denso Corporation are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i).No appearance has been made by any of the Defendants in this matter.The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to serve this Order on the designated service representative of each of the named Defendants in this case. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide proof of service of this Order to the Court. SO ORDERED by (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(il, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 22 EO: On July 28 2020, Plaintiff filed:PLAINTIFF ROMAN ANDERSON'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER (ECF No. #20 ).Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. and Defendant Denso International America, Inc. shall file their Responses on or before Wednesday, August 12, 2020.Plaintiff may file a Reply on or before Wednesday, August 26, 2020.The Court will notify the parties in due course whether a hearing will be held in court, by video conference, by telephone conference, or whether the matter will be submitted without a hearing pursuant to District of Hawaii Local Rule 7.1(c).No appearance has been made by any of the Defendants in this matter.The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to serve this Order on the designated service representative of each of the named Defendants in this case. Plaintiff's counsel shall provide proof of service of this Order to the Court. SO ORDERED by (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(il, ) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 29, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY-Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that pursuant to LR41.1, Documents #18 and #19 Notices of Dismissal require the Judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 21 REQUEST for Judicial Notice In Support of Plaintiff Roman Andersons Motion to Transfer by Roman Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Roman Anderson Plaintiff Roman Anderson's Notice of Motion and MOTION to Transfer - filed by Roman Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff Roman Anderson's Motion to Transfer, #2 Declaration of Timothy G. Blood In Support of Plaintiff Roman Anderson's Motion to Transfer, #3 Certificate of Service)(Chung, Steven) Docket Entry/Text Modified on 7/29/2020 (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Dismissal Plaintiff Roman Andersons Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Subaru Corporation and Denso Corporation Roman Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Dismissal Plaintiff Roman Andersons Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendants Subaru Corporation and Denso Corporation Roman Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO PAULA R. BROWN re: #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/28/2020. PAULA R. BROWN, ESQ. (Firm: Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO TIMOTHY G. BLOOD re: #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/28/2020. TIMOTHY G. BLOOD, ESQ. (Firm: Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Roman Anderson. Amendment to #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Paula R. Brown Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2399317. Declaration of Counsel. (Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Roman Anderson. Amendment to #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Timothy G. Blood Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2399298. Declaration of Counsel. (Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MICHAEL T. FRASER re: #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/21/2020. MICHAEL T. FRASER, ESQ. (Firm: The Fraser Law Firm, P.C.) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO COURTNEY L. DAVENPORT re: #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 7/21/2020. COURTNEY L. DAVENPORT, ESQ. (Firm: The Davenport Law Firm, LLC) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff(jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Michael T. Fraser Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2399327.Steven K.S. Chung appearing for Plaintiff Roman Anderson (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Designation and Consent of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Courtney L. Davenport Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2399324.Steven K.S. Chung appearing for Plaintiff Roman Anderson (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Designation and Consent of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Paula R. Brown Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2399317.Steven K.S. Chung appearing for Plaintiff Roman Anderson (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Designation and Consent of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Timothy G. Blood Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2399298.Steven K.S. Chung appearing for Plaintiff Roman Anderson (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Designation and Consent of Counsel, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Anderson. Denso International America, Inc. served on 7/9/2020. (Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jni) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 8/24/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements)(jni) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00290 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Chung, Steven) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT Roman Anderson, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated against Subaru of America, Inc., etc. et al ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2388973.), filed by Roman Anderson.(Chung, Steven) Docket Text Modified on 6/30/2020 (jo) [Transferred from Hawaii on 10/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Subaru of America, Inc., etc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denso International America Inc
Represented By: Michael L. Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denso Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America Inc
Represented By: Jerold T. Matayoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Anderson
Represented By: Courtney L. Davenport
Represented By: Michael T. Fraser
Represented By: Steven K.S. Chung
Represented By: Paula R. Brown
Represented By: Timothy G Blood
Represented By: Courtney Leigh Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?