US Specialty Insurance Company v. Mata Electric LLC et al
Plaintiff: US Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Erick A Mata Cabrera, Mata Construction LLC, Mata Electric LLC, Tina A Sharpe, Mata Auto LLC, Mata Electrical Contractors & Support LLC, La Perla NayaritaLLC and La Perla Nayarita LLC Birmingham
Case Number: 2:2020cv01722
Filed: November 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. Erick A Mata Cabrera served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. Tina A Sharpe served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. La Perla NayaritaLLC served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
December 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. La Perla Nayarita LLC Birmingham served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
December 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. Mata Auto LLC served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
December 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. Mata Construction LLC served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. Mata Electrical Contractors & Support LLC served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Specialty Insurance Company. Mata Electric LLC served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Stiff, L)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants delivered to plaintiff for service. (KAM)
November 6, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3710349 (B4601109521). related document #1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration of Surety Bond and Injunctive Relief against Erick A Mata Cabrera, La Perla Nayarita LLC Birmingham, La Perla NayaritaLLC, Mata Auto LLC, Mata Construction LLC, Mata Electric LLC, Mata Electrical Contractors & Support LLC, Tina A Sharpe, filed by US Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F)(KAM). (Stiff, L) Modified on 11/6/2020 (MEB2).
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER This matter is before the court on the Verified Complaint for Exoneration of Surety and Injunctive Relief filed by Plaintiff U.S. Specialty Insurance Company; The court notes that the body of the Complaint contains an Application for Temporary Restraining Order, but no separate Motion has been filed; the Application contained with the Verified Complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Any further request for the issuance of a temporary restraining order should be made by a separate motion entitled Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/3/2020. (KAM)
November 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration of Surety Bond and Injunctive Relief against Erick A Mata Cabrera, La Perla Nayarita LLC Birmingham, La Perla NayaritaLLC, Mata Auto LLC, Mata Construction LLC, Mata Electric LLC, Mata Electrical Contractors & Support LLC, Tina A Sharpe, filed by US Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Specialty Insurance Company v. Mata Electric LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Averie Louise Armstead
Represented By: L Graves Stiff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erick A Mata Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mata Construction LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mata Electric LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina A Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mata Auto LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mata Electrical Contractors & Support LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Perla NayaritaLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Perla Nayarita LLC Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?