Pinkerton et al v. Bardia et al
Plaintiff: Carlton Paul Pinkerton, Jr., Joseph Stott and JRT Wind LLC
Defendant: Prudencia LLC and Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia
Case Number: 2:2020cv01838
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Remand letter mailed to Shelby County Circuit Court first class mail. (AKD)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REMANDING CASE-For the reasons explained in the accompanying memorandum opinion, #15 , the court does not have jurisdiction to consider Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardias amended notice of removal, and this action is REMANDED back to the Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 12/11/2020. (AKD)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 12/11/2020. (AKD)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs JRT Wind LLC, Carlton Paul Pinkerton, Jr, Joseph Stott re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JRT Wind LLC, Carlton Paul Pinkerton, Jr, Joseph Stott. (Stott, Joseph)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY to Supplement to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Hutsler, Kearney)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Hutsler, Kearney)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hutsler, Kearney)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply-Accordingly, he has until December 9, 2020 to file a consolidated response to the plaintiffs motion to remand, #8 , and the plaintiffs response to the courts order to show cause, #7 . The plaintiffs reply, if any, is due by December 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 12/03/2020. (AKD)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601110000 (AKD)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #7 Response to Order to Show Cause, #3 Order to Show Cause,, Motion to Allow Reply by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Hutsler, Kearney)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by JRT Wind LLC, Carlton Paul Pinkerton, Jr, Joseph Stott. (Stott, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JRT Wind LLC, Carlton Paul Pinkerton, Jr, Joseph Stott. filed by JRT Wind LLC, Carlton Paul Pinkerton, Jr, Joseph Stott (Stott, Joseph)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3727078. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia from Circuit Court of Shelby County Alabama, case number 58-CV-2020-900776.00, filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kearney Dee Hutlser)(AKD). (Hutsler, Kearney)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause supplement filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Hutsler, Kearney)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jim Bardia)(Hutsler, Kearney)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RESPONSE to re #3 Order to Show Cause response filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Hutsler, Kearney)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-Accordingly, the court ORDERS Mr. Bardia to show cause by November 30, 2020 why this case should not be dismissed as prematurely removed pending discovery from the two principals of Prudencia LLC or dismissal of this defendant if the plaintiffs are so inclined in light of the representation that this entity is defunct. The plaintiffs response, if any, is due by December 4, 2020. In addition, to the extent the plaintiffs disagree with the representations in the Notice of Removal regarding the members and citizenship of JRT Wind LLC, the plaintiffs response is also due on December 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 11/23/2020. (AKD)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental affidavit by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia (Hutsler, Kearney)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia from Circuit Court of Shelby County Alabama, case number 58-CV-2020-900776.00, filed by Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kearney Dee Hutlser)(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinkerton et al v. Bardia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton Paul Pinkerton, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Stott
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JRT Wind LLC
Represented By: Joseph E Stott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudencia LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Miguel (Jim) Bardia
Represented By: Kearney D Hutsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?