Henderson v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Plaintiff: Erica Henderson
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01975
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Reassignment- The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable Gray M Borden. Please use case number 2:20-cv-1975-GMB on all subsequent pleadings. Judge Anna M Manasco no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Home Centers LLC. filed by Lowe's Home Centers LLC (Stewart, Charles)
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lowe's Home Centers LLC.(Stewart, Charles)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Henderson. Lowe's Home Centers LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (MEB2)
December 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers LLC. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Erica Henderson. (Winston, Lee)
December 11, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3733010 (B4601110185). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Lowe's Home Centers LLC, filed by Erica Henderson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Consent of Plaintiff) (MEB2). (Winston, Lee) Modified on 12/11/2020 (MEB2).
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lowe's Home Centers LLC, filed by Erica Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Consent of Plaintiff) (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Henderson
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers LLC
Represented By: Anne Knox Averitt
Represented By: Charles A Stewart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?