Green Acres Cafe Inc v. Original Green Acres Cafe LLC et al
Plaintiff: Green Acres Cafe Inc
Defendant: Original Green Acres Cafe LLC, Anthony B "Tony&quot Green, Jr and Mable L Gratton Green
Case Number: 2:2020cv02085
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Green Acres Cafe Inc as to Anthony B "Tony" Green, Jr, Original Green Acres Cafe LLC. (KEK)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Anthony B "Tony" Green, Jr, Mable L Gratton Green, Original Green Acres Cafe LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
January 20, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3757647. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Anthony B "Tony" Green, Jr, Mable L Gratton Green, Original Green Acres Cafe LLC, filed by Green Acres Cafe Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits)(KEK). (Watson, Joseph)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: To date, the plaintiff has failed to pay the fee required to file a complaint with the Court. The Court directs the plaintiff to pay the filing fee by 5 p.m. on January 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/14/2021. (YMB)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/7/2021. (KEK)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony B "Tony" Green, Jr, Mable L Gratton Green, Original Green Acres Cafe LLC, filed by Green Acres Cafe Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Acres Cafe Inc v. Original Green Acres Cafe LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Original Green Acres Cafe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony B "Tony&quot Green, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mable L Gratton Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Acres Cafe Inc
Represented By: John R Bowles
Represented By: Joseph E Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?