Scott v. United States of America
Petitioner: Demetria Scott
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv08034
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER appointing CJA counsel (Greg Reid) to assist Ms. Scott. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/15/2020. (YMB)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Ms. Scott has filed a pro se motion to appoint counsel and to order the BOP to allow her access to the law library. (Doc. #2 ). The Court grants the motion to appoint counsel; the Court finds as MOOT the law library part of the motion. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/10/2020. (cm petitioner) (YMB)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Order to BOP to allow access to law library and MOTION to Appoint Counsel for post conviction relief filed pro se by Demetria Scott. (YMB)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Demetria Scott.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Demetria Scott
Represented By: Gregory J Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas E Borton, IV
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: Melissa Kay Atwood
Represented By: Nicole Grosnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?