Egenberg v. Mainsail Digital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Egenberg
Defendant: Mainsail Digital LLC and Douglas Moore
Case Number: 2:2021cv00026
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bradley Egenberg. Douglas Moore waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Clark, John)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bradley Egenberg. Mainsail Digital LLC waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/21/2021. (Clark, John)
January 11, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3749300 (ALND receipt# B4601110726). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Mainsail Digital LLC, Douglas Moore, filed by Bradley Egenberg.(AKD). (Clark, John) Modified on 1/11/2021 (AKD).
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mainsail Digital LLC, Douglas Moore, filed by Bradley Egenberg.(AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Egenberg v. Mainsail Digital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Egenberg
Represented By: John W Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainsail Digital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?