Engler v. Devinci's Pizza, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anna Engler
Defendant: Devinci's Pizza, Inc. and John A. Day
Case Number: 2:2021cv00232
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/15/2021. (JLC)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Devinci's Pizza, Inc.. filed by Devinci's Pizza, Inc. (Smith, Lauren)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by John A. Day.(Smith, Lauren)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Devinci's Pizza, Inc..(Smith, Lauren)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Engler. Devinci's Pizza, Inc. served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Goldfarb, Jon)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Anna Engler. John A. Day served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Goldfarb, Jon)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to John A. Day, Devinci's Pizza, Inc., returned to Plaintiff for service on this the 19th day of February, 2021. (JLC)
February 18, 2021 Filing Fee received in the amount of $402.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3779159, NDAL receipt #B4601111543. (Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 2/18/2021 (JLC).
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John A. Day, Devinci's Pizza, Inc., filed by Anna Engler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engler v. Devinci's Pizza, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devinci's Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Day
Represented By: Lauren A Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Engler
Represented By: Lieselotte Carmen-Burks
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?