Coats v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Russell Coats
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00271
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER The parties' joint motion to extend the stay, Doc. #30 , is GRANTED, and this case is STAYED for sixty days. If settlement is not reached during those sixty days, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within sixty days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 7/15/21. (MRR, )
July 14, 2021 Filing 30 Joint MOTION to Stay and Joint Status Report by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Daly, Taylor)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER. The Joint Motion for Temporary Stay, Doc. #26 , is GRANTED, and this case is STAYED for ninety days. If settlement is not reached during those ninety days, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report within ninety days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/22/2021. (FNC)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #27 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/20/21. (MRR, )
April 19, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph R. Johnson by Russell Coats. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificates of Good Standing)(VanDerVeer, Nathan)
April 19, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3821144 (B4601112757). (VanDerVeer, Nathan) Modified on 4/20/2021 (MRR, ).
April 16, 2021 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Daly, Taylor)
March 29, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anna M Manasco: Status Conference held on 3/29/2021. (FNC)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #24 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/25/21. (MRR, )
March 25, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
March 25, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3804602 (B4601112232). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/26/2021 (MRR, ).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #22 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/24/21. (MRR, )
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803671 (B4601112203). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (MRR, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER- Certain deadlines and instructions apply as further set out within including: Discovery due by 1/18/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2022, Trial ready November 2022. Joint status report due January 5, 2022. Status Conference set for January 10, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. by Zoom. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/10/21. (MRR, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER- The court adopts the Case Management Orders previously entered in MDL 2641. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/10/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MRR, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #18 . Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/9/2021. (FNC)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS- with appendices I, II, and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/8/21. (MRR, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Rule 26(f) Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Rule 26(f) Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Rule 26(f) Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Rule 26(f) Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Rule 26(f) Report)(Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER. A Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021. Status Conference set for 3/29/2021 at 11:00 AM, by Zoom, before Judge Anna M Manasco. The court will provide the zoom information to the parties by email, one week prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/8/2021. (FNC)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C VanDerVeer on behalf of Russell Coats (VanDerVeer, Nathan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:21-cv-271-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 15, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 15, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:00 a.m. on March 9, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/24/21. (MRR, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-02136. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By Doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21015 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 12/30/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
June 29, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-2136-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
June 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13126509 filed by Russell Coats. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coats v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Represented By: Diane Babb Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Coats
Represented By: Joseph R Johnson
Represented By: Nathan C VanDerVeer
Represented By: Joseph Raymond Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?