Head et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Carol Ruth Head and Rufus F Head
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00273
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER - The parties Joint Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay, Doc. #26 , is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before June 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 4/1/21. (MRR, )
March 31, 2021 Filing 26 Joint Notice of Settlement and MOTION to Stay by Carol Ruth Head, Rufus F Head, Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, CR Bard Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Chermack, Kelly) Modified text and added filers on 4/1/2021 (MRR, ).
March 29, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anna M Manasco: Status Conference held on 3/29/2021. (FNC)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER - CHANGING TIME ONLY - Status Conference set for 3/29/2021 at 11:00 AM is RESET for 11:30 AM via Zoom, before Judge Anna M Manasco. The parties will be provided the zoom information by email. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/24/2021. (FNC)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER - Defendants' Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Docs. #22 & #23 , are GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/24/21. (MRR, )
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803679 (B4601112208). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (MRR, ).
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803667 (B4601112202). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (MRR, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER- Certain deadlines and instructions apply as further set out within including: Discovery due by 12/28/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 5/25/2022, Trial ready October 2022. Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2021. Status Conference set for December 13, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. by Zoom. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/10/21. (MRR, )
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER- The court adopts the Case Management Orders previously entered in MDL 2641. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/10/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(MRR, )
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #18 . Attorney Richard B North, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/9/2021. (FNC)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices I, II, and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/8/21. (MRR, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Collins Conlin on behalf of Carol Ruth Head, Rufus F Head (Conlin, Jon)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER. Attorney Chermack's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Doc. #12 , is GRANTED. Counsel are reminded that at least one attorney for each party may be required to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/8/2021. (FNC)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER. Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021. Status Conference set for 3/29/2021 at 11:00 AM, by Zoom before Judge Anna M Manasco. The court will provide the zoom information to the parties by email, one week prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/8/2021. (FNC)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Rule 26(f) Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Rule 26(f) Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Rule 26(f) Report, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Rule 26(f) Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Rule 26(f) Report)(Maughan, Diane)
March 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice by Carol Ruth Head, Rufus F Head. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas)(Chermack, Kelly)
March 5, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3791681 (B4601111897). (Chermack, Kelly) Modified on 3/10/2021 (MRR, ).
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Reassignment- Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:21-cv-273-AMM on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (MRR, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than March 15, 2021. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after March 15, 2021. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 11:15 a.m. on March 9, 2021. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/24/21. (MRR, )
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02630. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-02630-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16828217 filed by Rufus F Head, Carol Ruth Head. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Head et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ruth Head
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rufus F Head
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?