Hyche et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Joan Osborn and Joel Hyche
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00274
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay. (Doc. #17 ). The Court grants the motion and stays this case for 120 days to allow the parties the opportunity to finalize the settlement. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 4/21/2021. (YMB)
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Stay by Joel Hyche, Joan Osborn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chermack, Kelly)
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel Hyche, Joan Osborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Chermack, Kelly)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Taylor Daly's motion for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #14 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/25/2021. (YMB)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Taylor T. Daly by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Taylor Daly)(Morris, George)
March 25, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3804603. (Morris, George)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Brandee J. Kowalzyk's motion for admission pro hac vice in this action. (Doc. #12 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/23/2021. (YMB)
March 23, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3803664 (B4601112201). (Morris, George) Modified on 3/24/2021 (MRR, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brandee J. Kowalzyk by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing for Brandee Kowalzyk)(Morris, George)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Richard B. North, Jr's motion to withdraw as counsel of record in this action. (Doc. #10 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 3/10/2021. (YMB)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Maughan, Diane)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Collins Conlin on behalf of Joel Hyche, Joan Osborn (Conlin, Jon)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George L Morris, IV on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Morris, George)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane B Maughan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Maughan, Diane)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-02715. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 22, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Alabama via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *AMENDED By Doc. #4 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/12/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-2715-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16844099 filed by Joan Osborn, Joel Hyche. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 2/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyche et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Brandee J Kowalzyk
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Represented By: George L Morris, IV
Represented By: Diane B Maughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Osborn
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Hyche
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Kelly Chermack
Represented By: Jon Collins Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?