Rutherford v. Life Time Fitness Inc
Plaintiff: Theresa Rutherford
Defendant: Life Time Fitness Inc doing business as Life Time Fitness
3Rd Party Defendant: Chris Rutherford
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Life Time Fitness Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00377
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/14/2021. (JLC)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT- The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Karon O. Bowdre. Please use case number 2:21 CV 377 KOB on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Time Fitness Inc. filed by Life Time Fitness Inc (Sydnor, James)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Life Time Fitness Inc re #6 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sydnor, James)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Chris Rutherford by Life Time Fitness Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sydnor, James)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Theresa Rutherford. Life Time Fitness Inc served on 3/18/2021, answer due 4/8/2021. (AKD)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Life Time Fitness Inc. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Theresa Rutherford. (MEB2)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Time Fitness Inc, filed by Theresa Rutherford. (MEB2)
March 11, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3795523 (ALND receipt# B4601111996). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Life Time Fitness Inc, filed by Theresa Rutherford. (MEB2). (Foushee, Raymond) Modified on 3/11/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutherford v. Life Time Fitness Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Rutherford
Represented By: David Jeremy Schatz
Represented By: Raymond Christopher Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Time Fitness Inc doing business as Life Time Fitness
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chris Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Life Time Fitness Inc
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?