Manasco v. Best in Town et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Manasco
Defendant: Gregory L Jackson, Graham G Jackson and Best In Town Inc d/b/a THE FURNACE, an Alabama Corporation
Case Number: 2:2021cv00381
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan Manasco. Best In Town Inc served on 4/17/2021, answer due 5/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return on Service of Writ for Best in Town, Inc.)(Kristensen, John)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan Manasco. Gregory L Jackson served on 4/17/2021, answer due 5/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return on Service of Writ for Gregory L. Jackson)(Kristensen, John)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Best In Town Inc, Graham G Jackson, Gregory L Jackson. Delivered to Plaintiff for service. (AKD)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Jordan Manasco of Consent to Join by Katrina Perez and Logan Dodson (Attachments: #1 Katrina Perez Signed Consent, #2 Logan Dodson Signed Consent)(Kristensen, John)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion. Wayne Herring of ABC Legal is appointed as a special process server pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 3/17/2021. (CDG)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Jordan Manasco re #6 MOTION re #1 Complaint to appoint special process server Filing of Proposed Summonses (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Best in Town, Inc., #2 Proposed Summons Gregory Jackson, #3 Proposed Summons Graham Jackson)(Tortorici, Jason)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION re #1 Complaint to appoint special process server by Jordan Manasco. (Tortorici, Jason)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice attorney John P. Kristensen, but with the understanding and on the condition he pay the applicable fee and register for e-filing and notification within 14 days, unless he has already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 3/15/2021. (AVC)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John P. Kristensen Motion is RIPE 3/12/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jordan Manasco. (Tortorici, Jason)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jordan Manasco (AKD)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Best in Town, Graham G Jackson, Gregory L Jackson, filed by Jordan Manasco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(AKD)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3796755 (ALND receipt# B4601112026). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Best in Town, Graham G Jackson, Gregory L Jackson, filed by Jordan Manasco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(AKD). (Tortorici, Jason) Modified on 3/15/2021 (AKD).
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3796767 (ALND receipt# B4601112027). (Tortorici, Jason) Modified on 3/15/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manasco v. Best in Town et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Manasco
Represented By: Jason P Tortorici
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham G Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best In Town Inc d/b/a THE FURNACE, an Alabama Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?