Vincent v. Jefferson County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: Emily Vincent
Defendant: Sam Shade, Jefferson County Board of Education, Michael Turner and ATI Holdings LLC d/b/a ATI Physical Therapy
Case Number: 2:2021cv00514
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendant ATI Holdings, LLC's ("ATI"), motion for an extension of time to file its reply. (Doc. #26 ). ATI's reply in support of its motion to dismiss (doc. #13 ) is due on or before June 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/11/21. (MRR, )
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss by ATI Holdings LLC. (Ahnert, Janell)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jefferson County Board of Education's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Jefferson County Board of Education's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Exhibits filed by Emily Vincent. (Wilkinson, Cynthia)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant ATI Holdings, LLC's Motion to Dismiss filed by Emily Vincent. (Wilkinson, Cynthia)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER - The court GRANTS #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/9/21. (SAC)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT JEFFERSON COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Emily Vincent. (Wilkinson, Cynthia)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff Emily Vincent's unopposed motion for an extension of time. (Doc. #20 ). Ms. Vincent SHALL file a response to Defendant ATI Holdings, LLC's, motion to dismiss on or before June 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/8/2021. (KEK)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE DAY EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT ATI HOLDINGS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Emily Vincent. (Wilkinson, Cynthia)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Defendants Michael Turner and Sam Shade's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Sam Shade, Michael Turner.(Boardman, Mark)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/26/21. (SAC)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER re #16 Defendant Jefferson County Board of Education's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint - Plaintiff's Response is due on or before June 9, 2021; a reply, if any, is due on or before June 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/26/21. (SAC) Modified on 5/26/2021 (SAC).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Jefferson County Board of Education's Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Jefferson County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Employee Action Form, #2 Exhibit B. Resignation Letter, #3 Exhibit C. Board Policy 3.10.1, #4 Exhibit D. Board Policy 5.2.3)(Johnson, Carl)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER re #13 Motion to Dismiss - Plaintiff's response is due on or before June 8, 2021; a reply, if any, is due on or before June 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 5/25/21. (SAC)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ATI Holdings LLC. filed by ATI Holdings LLC (Ahnert, Janell)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by ATI Holdings LLC. (Schach, Patrick)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Vincent. ATI Holdings LLC served on 5/10/2021, answer due 5/31/2021. (KEK)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine H Watkins on behalf of Sam Shade, Michael Turner (Watkins, Katherine)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S Boardman on behalf of Sam Shade, Michael Turner (Boardman, Mark)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted (green cards not signed or dated) by Emily Vincent as to Jefferson County Board of Education, Sam Shade, Michael Turner. (KEK)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to ATI Holdings LLC, Jefferson County Board of Education, Sam Shade, Michael Turner. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emily Vincent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Wilkinson, Cynthia)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This case is before the court on a sua sponte review of the complaint. For the reasons below, the court STRIKES the complaint and ORDERS Ms. Vincent to replead it in conformity with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the pleading standards of the Eleventh Circuit. Accordingly, the court STRIKES the complaint. On or before May 6, 2021, Ms. Vincent SHALL replead her complaint in conformity with Rules 8(a)(2) and 10(b) and the Eleventh Circuit's instructions about pleading a complaint. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/21/2021. (KEK)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Emily Vincent. ATI Holdings LLC served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (KEK)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons and Complaint Returned With COVID-19 Notation from Postal Employee as to Sam Shade and Jefferson County Board of Education by Emily Vincent. (KEK)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ATI Holdings LLC, Jefferson County Board of Education, Sam Shade, Michael Turner. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3817025. related document #1 COMPLAINT against ATI Holdings LLC, Jefferson County Board of Education, Sam Shade, Michael Turner, filed by Emily Vincent.(KEK). (Wilkinson, Cynthia)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Emily Vincent. (KEK)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ATI Holdings LLC, Jefferson County Board of Education, Sam Shade, Michael Turner, filed by Emily Vincent.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent v. Jefferson County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Vincent
Represented By: Richard A Bearden
Represented By: Cynthia F Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Shade
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Katherine H Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Board of Education
Represented By: Carl E Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Samantha K Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Turner
Represented By: Mark S Boardman
Represented By: Katherine H Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATI Holdings LLC d/b/a ATI Physical Therapy
Represented By: Janell M Ahnert
Represented By: Patrick Drake Schach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?