Wattson v. Town of Brookside, Alabama
Plaintiff: Sean Wattson
Defendant: Town of Brookside, Alabama
Case Number: 2:2021cv00649
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Certain deadlines and time limits apply as set out herein. Discovery prior to Class Certification due by 12/15/2022; Motion for Class Certification due by 12/15/2022; Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2022; Status Conference set for 12/12/2022 at 11:00 AM by Zoom, before Judge Anna M Manasco. The court will provide the zoom information to the parties by email. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 3/1/2022. (FNC)
February 25, 2022 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clark, Brian)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER. The court GRANTS #19 . Attorney Hansel Eli Lightner, II terminated. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/22/2022. (FNC)
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sean Wattson. (Lightner, Hansel)
February 22, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura S Gibson on behalf of Sean Wattson (Gibson, Laura)
February 22, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Hope S Marshall on behalf of Sean Wattson (Marshall, Hope)
February 15, 2022 Filing 16 RESPONSE to re #14 filed by Sean Wattson. (Lightner, Hansel)
February 3, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Town of Brookside, Alabama.(Kinney, Richard)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff perfected service on defendant Town of Brookside, Alabama on May 26, 2021. No answer has been filed by defendant, nor has plaintiff applied for an entry of default by the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing by February 14, 2022, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/3/2022. (FNC)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II, and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 2/3/2022. (FNC)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER; The motion to dismiss by Defendant The Town of Brookside, AlabamaDoc #6 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff Sean Wattson's claims under the Fourth and Fourteenth Amendments are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and his claim under the Eighth Amendment is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Town's motion to dismiss Mr. Wattson's claim under the Takings Clause of the Fifth Amendment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 11/4/2021. (DNW, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Town of Brookside, Alabama re: #1 Complaint, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #9 Response (other) filed by Town of Brookside, Alabama. (Kinney, Richard)
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Porter, II on behalf of Town of Brookside, Alabama (Porter, James)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to re #6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sean Wattson. (Lightner, Hansel)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by K Mark Parnell on behalf of All Defendants (Parnell, K)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER- Any response to the motion to dismiss, Doc. #6 , is due on or before JULY 12, 2021. Any reply is due on or before JULY 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/21/21. (MRR, )
June 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 7/12/2021 Replies due by 7/26/2021. (MRR, )
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss and Supporting Brief by Town of Brookside, Alabama. (Kinney, Richard) Modified docket text on 6/16/2021 (MRR, ).
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sean Wattson. filed by Sean Wattson (Clark, Brian)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sean Wattson. Town of Brookside, Alabama served on 5/26/2021 (no date on green card), answer due 6/16/2021. (MRR, )
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Town of Brookside, Alabama. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sean Wattson. (Clark, Brian)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Town of Brookside, Alabama, filed by Sean Wattson.(MRR, )
May 7, 2021 Request for service by certified mail within the body of the complaint filed by Sean Wattson. (MRR, )
May 7, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3835680 (B4601113243). related document #1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Town of Brookside, Alabama, filed by Sean Wattson.(MRR, ). (Clark, Brian) Modified on 5/11/2021 (MRR, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wattson v. Town of Brookside, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Wattson
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Represented By: Brian M Clark
Represented By: J Mark White
Represented By: Allan L Armstrong
Represented By: Darrell L Cartwright
Represented By: Hope S Marshall
Represented By: Laura S Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Brookside, Alabama
Represented By: K Mark Parnell
Represented By: Richard Warren Kinney, III
Represented By: James W Porter, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?