McConico v. Top Golf International Inc et al
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr.
Defendant: Top Golf International Inc, Dolf Berle, Erik Anderson, Callaway Golf Company, Oliver G Brewer, III, West River Group, Providence Equity Partners, Dundon Capital Partners, Thomas Dundon, Jefferson County Civic Authority, Jefferson County Commission and Johnathan M Nelson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01024
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 18 USCA Case Number 21-13215 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by James McConico, Jr. (KEK)
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 Transmission of #15 Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #15 Notice of Appeal. (KEK)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL SHEET to the Eleventh Circuit Court of Appeals re #15 . (KEK)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Order by James McConico, Jr. (KEK)
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 USCA Case Number 21-13127-J for #11 Notice of Appeal filed by James McConico, Jr. (PSM)
September 13, 2021 Filing 13 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal (AKD)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 Transmittal letter to 11th Circuit Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal (AKD)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL by James McConico, Jr. (AKD)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - On September 7, 2021, one day before the magistrate judge entered McConico's objection, the Court denied McConico's motion to vacate Judge Acker's 1997 order in Case No. 2:97-cv-02538-WMA, doc. 15. The Court found McConico continues to file civil actions that are patently frivolous and without merit, and that there is no reason to vacate or modify Judge Acker's 1997 order requiring prescreening, even in instances where McConico attempts to pay the filing fee. (Id.). For these reasons, McConico's objections are OVERRULED. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/10/2021. (KEK)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-The above-styled civil action has been reassigned to the Honorable L. Scott Coogler. Please use case number 2:21 CV 1024 LSC on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 Objection's to the Mag/Judge's Order of August 12th, 2021 Erroneous Dismissal of Plaintiff's Civil Complaint that Contained Cognizable Claims Involving Real Property filed by James McConico, Jr. (AKD)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER- Accordingly, for the reasons stated herein, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reject McConico's August 16, 2021 and August 26, 2021 filings. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to file into Case No. 2:21-cv-1024-JHE McConico's August 20, 2021 filing titled Objections to the Mag/Judges Order of August 12, 2021 Erroneous Dismissal of Plaintiffs Civil Complaint that Contained Cognizable Claims Involving Real Property and to assign a United States District Judge to the case to review McConico's objection regarding the 1997 Prescreening Order and any other issue the District Judge deems appropriate for review. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 09/08/2021. (AKD)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER-On September 24, 1997, United States District Judge William M. Acker, Jr. entered an order instructing the Clerk not to file or give a case number to papers submitted by Mr. McConico without pre-screening by a judge or a magistrate judge of this court. Having reviewed Mr. McConicos complaint, it is patently frivolous and without merit. Much like the last case, this courts lacks subject-matter jurisdiction and, even if the court had jurisdiction, McConicos claims are time-barred by all relevant statutes of limitation. Accordingly, the clerk is DIRECTED to withdraw the complaint, refund the filing fee, and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 08/12/2021. (AKD)
August 10, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601115107 (AKD)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing request of case status by James McConico, Jr (AKD)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by James McConico, Jr (AKD)
July 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate Prior Judge William Acher's Order by James McConico, Jr. (AKD)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 **WITHDRAWN** (pursuant to order #6 ) COMPLAINT against Erik Anderson, Dolf Berle, Oliver G Brewer, III, Callaway Golf Company, Thomas Dundon, Dundon Capital Partners, Jefferson County Civic Authority, Jefferson County Commission, Johnathan M Nelson, Providence Equity Partners, Top Golf International Inc, West River Group, filed by James McConico, Jr.(AKD) Modified on 8/12/2021 (AKD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConico v. Top Golf International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McConico, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Golf International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolf Berle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callaway Golf Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver G Brewer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West River Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Equity Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dundon Capital Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dundon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Civic Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?