Rogers v. Alabama, State of et al
Plaintiff: Frankie Thomas Rogers
Defendant: Alabama, State of, Oneonta, City of, Charles Clifton, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth, Jason Moore, Skint Knuckle Garage & Towing and Mark Moon
Case Number: 2:2021cv01065
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - In light of Mr. Rogers filing his amended complaint (doc. #9 ), the court DENIES Defendants' motions to dismiss (docs. #3 & #6 ) as moot. The court GRANTS Defendants' motion to maintain the temporary stay of the parties' obligations under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 (doc. #12 ), pending resolution of the renewed motions to dismiss (docs. #10 , #11 ). Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/22/2021. (KEK)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Alabama, State of and #11 Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth. Plaintiff's responses to these motions are due by October 13, 2021. Replies by the defendants are due by October 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/22/21. (SAC)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Motion to Maintain the Temporarily Stay of Discovery and Suspension of Rule 26 Obligations by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth. (Anderson, Allen)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth. (Anderson, Allen)
September 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion To Dismiss Defendant State of Alabama by Alabama, State of. (Howell, Laura)
September 7, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alabama, State of, Charles Clifton, Jason Moore, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Skint Knuckle Garage & Towing, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth, Mark Moon, filed by Frankie Thomas Rogers.(KEK)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - On review of the two motions to dismiss that are pending in this case, the court has determined that Plaintiff Frankie Thomas Rogers' complaint is a shotgun pleading. Accordingly, the court STRIKES the complaint and ORDERS Mr. Rogers to replead it in conformity with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8(a)(2) and 10(b), the Eleventh Circuit's instructions for properly pleading a complaint, and this court's instructions set out below. The court GRANTS Defendants' motion to temporarily stay proceedings until after they respond to Mr. Rogers' first amended complaint. The Plaintiff Frankie Thomas Rogers SHALL file an amended complaint on or before September 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/19/2021. (KEK)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William P Gray, Jr on behalf of Matthew Suddeth (Gray, William)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant State of Alabama by Alabama, State of. (Howell, Laura)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Temporarily Stay Discovery and Suspend Rule 26 Obligations by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth. (Anderson, Allen)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Alabama, State of NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Howell, Laura)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth. (Anderson, Allen)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal (Anderson, Allen)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth from Circuit Court of Blount County, Alabama, case number 08-cv-2021-000084, filed by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK)
August 3, 2021 State court complaint filed 6/28/2021. See Doc #1 , Exhibit A, pages 2-7. (KEK)
August 3, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3897143. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth from Circuit Court of Blount County, Alabama, case number 08-cv-2021-000084, filed by Charles Clifton, Oneonta, City of, Richard Phillips, Amanda Stanfield, Matthew Suddeth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KEK). (Anderson, Allen)
August 3, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint filed 7/29/2021 by Jason Moore, Skint Knuckle Garage & Towing. See Doc #1 , Exhibit A, pages 18-19.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Alabama, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Thomas Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama, State of
Represented By: Laura E Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneonta, City of
Represented By: Allen L Anderson
Represented By: Patrick E Sebesta, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Clifton
Represented By: Allen L Anderson
Represented By: Patrick E Sebesta, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Phillips
Represented By: Allen L Anderson
Represented By: Patrick E Sebesta, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Stanfield
Represented By: Allen L Anderson
Represented By: Patrick E Sebesta, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Suddeth
Represented By: Allen L Anderson
Represented By: Patrick E Sebesta, II
Represented By: William P Gray, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skint Knuckle Garage & Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?