Grier v. Publix Alabama LLC
Plaintiff: Katrena Grier
Defendant: Publix Alabama LLC d/b/a Publix
Case Number: 2:2021cv01090
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/8/2021. (KAM)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Publix Alabama LLC. filed by Publix Alabama LLC (Schach, Patrick)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Publix Alabama LLC.(Bradford, Stacey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katrena Grier. Publix Alabama LLC served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (KAM)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Publix Alabama LLC. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Katrena Grier. (KEK)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Publix Alabama LLC, filed by Katrena Grier.(KEK)
August 10, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3901051 (ALND B4601115137) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Publix Alabama LLC, filed by Katrena Grier.(KEK). (Schatz, David) Modified on 8/11/2021 (KEK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grier v. Publix Alabama LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrena Grier
Represented By: David Jeremy Schatz
Represented By: Raymond Christopher Foushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Alabama LLC d/b/a Publix
Represented By: Patrick Drake Schach
Represented By: Stacey T Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?