Cargill v. United States of America et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Quincetta Y. Cargill
Defendant: United States of America, Joseph Biden, Kamala Harris, Attorney General William Barr, Randolph Neeley, United States District Court, Robert Neeley and Merrick Garland
Case Number: 2:2021cv01186
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Quincetta Y. Cargill. (JLC)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:21-cv-00240. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: (1) The magistrate judge's recommendation (Doc. #10 ) is adopted. (2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama. The clerk of the court is DIRECTED to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/30/2021. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred viaCM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order No objections filed to the #10 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Mail Returned as Undeliverable; Copy of #10 Recommendation sent to Quincetta Y. Cargill returned with the following USPS notation, "Return to sender; No mail receptacle; Unable to Forward." (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1404. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 7/30/2021. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Quincetta Y. Cargill. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Joseph Biden, Kamala Harris, United States District Court, United States of America, Randolph Neeley, Merrick Garland, filed by Quincetta Y. Cargill.(cwl, ) Modified on 5/11/2021 to correct the name of def Neeley (cwl, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 5/19/2021, Plf shall file an amended complaint on a form for use in filing a complaint. Plf's original complaint shall be superseded by this amended complaint, as further set out in order. It is further ORDERED that Plf's amended complaint shall: 1) Contain one claim and any claim(s) that can be shown closely related to it as further set out in order; 2) Names as defs only those individuals he contends are personally responsible for the alleged violations of his constitutional rights as described in paragraph 1; 3) Specifically describes, in a concise, non-rambling, and non-narrative manner, how each def listed in the amended complaint acted in a manner that deprived her of her constitutional rights, as further set out in order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to provide her with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file a complaint, and Plf shall use this form in filing her amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 5/4/2021. (form mailed as directed)(cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Received Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 9.82, receipt number 4602063115. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 , #4 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $9.82 be paid on or before 4/29/2021; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at the Montgomery County Detention Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 4/8/2021. (furn: cashier) (cwl, )[Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Quincetta Cargill. (cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that on or before 4/14/2021, Plf shall file a properly completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by an inmate account statement, as further set out in order; To aid Plf in complying with the directives of this order, the Clerk is DIRECTED to (i) provide Plf with an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and (ii) furnish a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the Montgomery County Detention Facility. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 3/24/2021. (IFP form mailed & copy mailed to acct clerk as directed)(cwl, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Quincetta Cargill. (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against William Barr, Joseph Biden, Kamala Harris, United States Department of Justice, United States District Court, United States of America, filed by Quincetta Cargill.(es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Quincetta Cargill. (No PDF document attached - see docket entry #1 ). (es, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 8/30/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cargill v. United States of America et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincetta Y. Cargill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?