Biggart v. Marshall et al
Petitioner: Thomas Sterling Biggart, Jr
Respondent: Steve Marshall and Jimmy Thomas
Case Number: 2:2021cv01272
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the court will treat this case ripe for summary disposition; petitioner shall have 21 days to supply any additional evidentiary materials.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/9/2021. (KAM)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Steve Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit B-2, #8 Exhibit C-1, #9 Exhibit C-2, #10 Exhibit D-1 Part 1, #11 Exhibit D-1 Part 2, #12 Exhibit D-1 Part 3, #13 Exhibit D-2, #14 Exhibit E-1, #15 Exhibit E-2, #16 Exhibit F-1, #17 Exhibit F-2, #18 Exhibit F-3)(Saxon, Yvonne)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Respondents' answer is due by November 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 10/21/2021. (CDG)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Steve Marshall. (Saxon, Yvonne)
September 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Yvonne A H Saxon on behalf of Steve Marshall (Saxon, Yvonne)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE This is a petition for a writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Petitioner Thomas Sterling Biggart, Jr. challenges his 2016 conviction in the Shelby County Circuit Court for sexual abuse of a child less than twelve years old, for which he was sentenced to twenty years in prison. #1 . Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, why the relief the petitioner requests should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/22/2021. (PSM)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING Petitioner Thomas Sterling Biggart, Jr.'s pleading is deficient for the reason(s) indicated within. Petitioner must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/22/2021. (PSM)
September 22, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number B4601115913 (KAM)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Brief re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Thomas Sterling Biggart, Jr. (PSM)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Thomas Sterling Biggart, Jr.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggart v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Sterling Biggart, Jr
Represented By: John D Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Marshall
Represented By: Yvonne A H Saxon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jimmy Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?