Simmons v. Napa Transportation Inc et al
Plaintiff: Emmett T Simmons
Defendant: Napa Transportation Inc and Dan Allen Thompson
Case Number: 2:2021cv01442
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER governing further proceedings in this action unless modified for good cause shown: Discovery due by 8/5/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2022; Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2022. The parties shall be ready for trial in May 2023, to be scheduled by separate order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/3/21. (SAC)
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wilson, David)
November 1, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Napa Transportation Inc. filed by Napa Transportation Inc (Wilson, David)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 10/28/21. (SAC)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Napa Transportation Inc, Dan Allen Thompson.(Wilson, David)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Napa Transportation Inc, Dan Allen Thompson from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2021-900492. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(KEK)
October 27, 2021 State court complaint deemed filed 9/14/2021. See Doc #1 , Exhibit 2. (KEK)
October 27, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3951514. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Napa Transportation Inc, Dan Allen Thompson from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, Alabama, case number 68-cv-2021-900492. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(KEK). (Wilson, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Napa Transportation Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett T Simmons
Represented By: Christin Renee French
Represented By: G Courtney French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa Transportation Inc
Represented By: David M Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan Bain Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Allen Thompson
Represented By: David M Wilson
Represented By: Jonathan Bain Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?