SONDHI v. MCPHERSON OIL CO. et al
Plaintiff: MANOJ SONDHI
Defendant: MCPHERSON OIL CO., THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER, JOHN DOES 1-10, JANE DOES 1-10, ABC PARTNERSHIPS 1-10 and XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv01537
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting Attorney Jacqueline Voronov's #23 motion to withdraw as counsel. Attorney Jacqueline Voronov terminated. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/14/2022. (KEK)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MCPHERSON OIL CO.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Williams, Carl)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon: Telephone Conference held on 1/10/2022. Present: Teddy Strickland & Richard Owens; re 19 Text Order/Rule 83.1 - Deft now has local counsel/NJ counsel will file MTW; pla's counsel has 7 days to either note a case resolution or file PHV Mtn/obtain local counsel. (SAC)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Christian Williams on behalf of THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER, MCPHERSON OIL CO. (Williams, Carl)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard R Owens on behalf of THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER, MCPHERSON OIL CO. (Owens, Richard)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER - The court sets a Telephone Conference for January 10, 2022, 9:30 AM, before Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Parties will receive the numbers needed to join the call by e-mail. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/5/22. (SAC)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: This case was transferred to the Northern District of Alabama (NDAL) on November 17, 2021. All counsel are instructed to carefully review and follow this court's Local Rule 83.1(b) regarding case appearances pro hac vice as well as designation and duties of local counsel. Counsel have not met the 10-day deadline as set out by this rule and are ORDERED to obtain local counsel and file appropriate motions for pro hac vice admission on or before December 23, 2021. The NDAL requires all counsel of record to be registered for electronic court filing & notifications. Each attorney is to register for an account on the Court's Electronic Case Files (ECF) System located at https://ecf.alnd.uscourts.gov/attyreg/InputAttorneyPHV.cfm. All counsel are to complete this registration within five days of entering their notice of appearance if they have not already done so. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/9/21. (SAC)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 12/6/21. (SAC)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:20-cv-13986. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order transferring case to the Northern District of Alabama; ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is Denied #10 . Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/17/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 11/17/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert B. Kugler for all further proceedings. Judge Christine P. O'Hearn no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/17/21. (mmb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Christine P. O'Hearn for all further proceedings. Judge Robert B. Kugler no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/12/2021. (dmw, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021..(mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill no longer assigned to case. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Letter from Teddy C. Strickland, Jr. Esq. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings,. (STRICKLAND, TEDDY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER, MCPHERSON OIL CO.. Responses due by 4/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Google Map, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order)(VORONOV, JACQUELINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider no longer assigned to case. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: In light of the #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the #5 Motion to Dismiss is hereby deemed withdrawn. SO ORDERED by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 3/2/2021. (lm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER, MCPHERSON OIL CO. (VORONOV, JACQUELINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by MANOJ SONDHI re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(STRICKLAND, TEDDY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on McPherson Oil Co on 11/04/2020, filed by MANOJ SONDHI. (STRICKLAND, TEDDY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER, MCPHERSON OIL CO.. Responses due by 2/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order)(VORONOV, JACQUELINE) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MANOJ SONDHI.(STRICKLAND, TEDDY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) days, etc. Signed by Judge Robert B. Kugler on 10/7/2020. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER, MCPHERSON OIL CO.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11461050) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MANOJ SONDHI.(STRICKLAND, TEDDY) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information is to be entered as it appears in the Caption of the Complaint, In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/17/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SONDHI v. MCPHERSON OIL CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANOJ SONDHI
Represented By: TEDDY CONROY STRICKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCPHERSON OIL CO.
Represented By: JACQUELINE VORONOV
Represented By: Carl Christian Williams
Represented By: Richard R Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS KARL BRIDGEWATER
Represented By: JACQUELINE VORONOV
Represented By: Carl Christian Williams
Represented By: Richard R Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC PARTNERSHIPS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?