White v. Dunn
Petitioner: Justin Matthew White
Respondent: Jefferson S Dunn
Case Number: 2:2021cv01700
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Jackson Hughes on behalf of Jefferson S Dunn (Hughes, Beth)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 1/4/2022. (SRD)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Justin Matthew White. The court APPOINTS attorneys Leslie S. Smith and Allyson R. duLac to represent White in this 2254 proceeding. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/27/2021. (SRD)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Justin Matthew White. (KEK)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Justin Matthew White. (KEK)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Stay of Execution, filed by Justin Matthew White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Justin Matthew White
Represented By: Allyson Renee Dulac
Represented By: Leslie Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jefferson S Dunn
Represented By: Beth Jackson Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?