Higgins et al v. Minor Farms LLC et al
Plaintiff: Henry Higgins and Sharon Higgins
Defendant: Minor Farms LLC, John Minor, IV, Reynolds Wood Products, LLC and Horton Logging, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00656
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' joint motion #9 for an extension of time to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26 obligations until after Defendants Reynolds Wood Products, LLC and Horton Logging, LLC answer Plaintiff's amended complaint. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/7/2022. (KEK)
July 6, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Annemarie Carney Axon. Please use case number 2:22 CV 656 ACA on all subsequent pleadings Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (AKD)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER-Because the plaintiffs have not identified the members of Reynolds Wood Products or Horton Logging or the citizenships of those members, they have failed to sufficiently allege the citizenship of Reynolds Wood Products or Horton Logging. However, in the interest of focusing the parties' anticipated arguments and moving forward expeditiously, the court ORDERS that within fourteen (14) calendar days the plaintiffs must file a second amended complaint that properly alleges the citizenships of Reynolds Wood Products and Horton Logging. The second amended complaint SHALL be complete and not incorporate by reference or refer to a previously filed document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 07/05/2022. (AKD)
June 30, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE to remind parties that the deadline to submit forms indicating whether they consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 is July 5, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the case will be reassigned after July 5, 2022. (BST, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Rule 26(f) Report Motion is RIPE 6/3/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by John Minor, IV, Minor Farms LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time for Rule 26(f) Report)(Williams, Christopher)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Minor, IV, Minor Farms LLC, Reynolds Wood Products, LLC, Horton Logging, L.L.C., filed by Henry Higgins, Sharon Higgins.(Edge, H)
June 3, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B4601120577 (AKD)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/23/2022. (BST, )
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 5, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after July 5, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 05/23/2022. (AKD)
May 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicolas Howard Peck on behalf of John Minor, IV, Minor Farms LLC (Peck, Nicolas)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Minor, IV, Minor Farms LLC. filed by John Minor, IV, Minor Farms LLC (Williams, Christopher)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by John Minor, IV, Minor Farms LLC.(Williams, Christopher)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT of a magistrate judge in a civil action. (KEK)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Minor, IV, Minor Farms LLC from Circuit Court of Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2022-900225. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK)
May 20, 2022 State court complaint deemed filed 4/20/2022. See Doc #1 , Exhibit A, pages 3-9. (KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins et al v. Minor Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Higgins
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Higgins
Represented By: H Arthur Edge, III
Represented By: Ethan Daniel Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minor Farms LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Williams
Represented By: Nicolas Howard Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Minor, IV
Represented By: Christopher J Williams
Represented By: Nicolas Howard Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynolds Wood Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horton Logging, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?