Monk et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Bobby Dean Monk, Ronald Lee Grubb, David Keith Gunter, Bobby Dean Monk, Sr, John Gutierrez, Duane Francis Hahn, Jeremy Hako, Martin Land, Steven Trent Hall, Kelly K Ham, Jerame Allen Hamrick, James Thomas Harris, III, Steven James Hartmann, Aaron Patrick Haverty, Timothy Len Haynes, James Neal Helderman, Victor Joe Hernandez, Benjamin J Heslep, Greg Michael Hill, James Frances Hogan, Lonnie J Hopkins, Daniel Kermit Hottenstein, Clifford Huebner, Matthew Dane Human, Mark Charles Hunsaker, William Hutchison, Malcolm Wayne Jackson, Richard McCormack, Marc Read Jaffrey, Jaleel Jibreel, Peter Janulis, Deana Lynn Jennings, John Robert Jennings, William Andrew Jennings, Christen Matthew Johnsen, Robert Arling Johnson, John Randolph Jones, Stephen Todd Jones, Edward James Kelly, Kevin Kyle Kelly, Tobias J Kerby, Bruce Ray Kirk, Andre Knight, Randal Kobyluk, Doug W Kooiman, Larry Michael Kopp, Wayne Krantz, George L Kreafle, Jr, Brian Edward Kroll, Richard Nelson Krom, Stephen T Kruszalnicki, Jeffery Lynn Lacomb, Michael John Landen, Terry Morrow, Michael Thomas Larkins, Lynn Latham, Peter James LeCompte, Jeffrey Harlen Lee, James Edgar Leonard, Eduardo Linares, Richard Lindahl, David Lee Lineberger, Steven Edward Lipford, John Thomas Locascio, Thomas Lockhart, Lon Cameron Lockwood, John Curtis Longacre, Jeffery Lott, Frederick William Lowery, Curtis Lionel Luckett, Jr, Randall Dean Lynn, Jerry Charles Lyons, Kyle David Murphy, George B Madison, James Edwin Maile, Dennis Joseph Mann, Angelo A Marchese, Brian James Markewinski, Lane A Marsh, Layman Martin, Victor Manuel Martinez, David Walter Masirovits, Rex Allen Mathre, Stephan James Matney, John Thomas Mattson, John L Mauldin, Jr, Ronald William Maury, Joseph Michael Mazza, Jr, Willie H McCue, Jr, Byron Patterson McDaniel, Jr, James Michael McDonald, Daniel John McKay, Thomas George McKelvey, Francis Michael McKenna, David Phillip McKinney, Robert James George McKnight, III, Donald Parke McLean, Jr, Andrew B Meach, William Charley Meddings, Thomas Earl Meese, Daniel Patrick Melican, Sr, Guinavere Meneely, Montressor Cortez Merrill, Thomas Jon Merz, William Kenneth Meyer, Douglas E Miller, Kurt Laroy Miller, Mark Mohler, Jeffery Wayne Routier, Jay Morgenthal, Jeffrey Allan Morin, Sr, Michael Vincent Morris, II and Rashid Muhammad
Defendant: 3M Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc and Amerex Corporation
Case Number: 2:2023cv00043
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina (KAM)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Defendant 3M Company has filed a motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #3 ). 3M requests that to the extent this action is transferred to the In re Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability multi-district litigation (the "AFFF MDL") its deadline to respond to the complaint be in accordance with the AFFF MDL rules, and that to the extent the action is not transferred to the AFFF MDL it be afforded 28 days after the AFFF MDL court's decision denying a request to transfer within which to file a responsive pleading in this action. The motion is GRANTED to the extent the court stays the deadline for the defendants to respond to the complaint pending a decision by the AFFF MDL court whether to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL. 3M SHALL notify this court promptly if the AFFF MDL court denies its request to transfer this case to the AFFF MDL, at which time this court will set a new deadline for responsive pleadings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 01/19/2023. (CTF)
January 13, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of case to a U. S. magistrate judge for trial this 13th day of January, 2023. (CTF)
January 12, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion is RIPE 1/12/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by 3M Company. (Radney, W)
January 12, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (KAM)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 22-903766., filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit Notice)(KAM)
January 12, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4247616. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 22-903766., filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit A-5, # 6 Exhibit Notice)(KAM). (Radney, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monk et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Benjamin Phillip Harmon
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Represented By: M Christian King
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Benjamin Phillip Harmon
Represented By: M Christian King
Represented By: W Larkin Radney, IV
Represented By: Harlan Irby Prater, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Dean Monk
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Grubb
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Keith Gunter
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Dean Monk, Sr
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gutierrez
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Francis Hahn
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hako
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Land
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Trent Hall
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly K Ham
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerame Allen Hamrick
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Thomas Harris, III
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven James Hartmann
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Patrick Haverty
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Len Haynes
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Neal Helderman
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Joe Hernandez
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin J Heslep
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Michael Hill
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Frances Hogan
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie J Hopkins
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kermit Hottenstein
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Huebner
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Dane Human
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Charles Hunsaker
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Hutchison
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcolm Wayne Jackson
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McCormack
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Read Jaffrey
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaleel Jibreel
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Janulis
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Lynn Jennings
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Robert Jennings
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Andrew Jennings
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christen Matthew Johnsen
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Arling Johnson
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Randolph Jones
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Todd Jones
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward James Kelly
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kyle Kelly
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobias J Kerby
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Ray Kirk
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Knight
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randal Kobyluk
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug W Kooiman
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Michael Kopp
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Krantz
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L Kreafle, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Edward Kroll
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nelson Krom
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen T Kruszalnicki
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Lynn Lacomb
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John Landen
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Morrow
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas Larkins
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Latham
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter James LeCompte
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Harlen Lee
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edgar Leonard
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Linares
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lindahl
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lee Lineberger
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Edward Lipford
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas Locascio
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Lockhart
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lon Cameron Lockwood
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Curtis Longacre
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Lott
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick William Lowery
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Lionel Luckett, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Dean Lynn
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Charles Lyons
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle David Murphy
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George B Madison
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edwin Maile
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joseph Mann
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo A Marchese
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian James Markewinski
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane A Marsh
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Layman Martin
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Manuel Martinez
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walter Masirovits
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Allen Mathre
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan James Matney
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Thomas Mattson
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Mauldin, Jr
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald William Maury
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Mazza, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie H McCue, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Patterson McDaniel, Jr
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Michael McDonald
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel John McKay
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas George McKelvey
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Michael McKenna
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Phillip McKinney
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert James George McKnight, III
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Parke McLean, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew B Meach
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Charley Meddings
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Earl Meese
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Patrick Melican, Sr
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guinavere Meneely
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montressor Cortez Merrill
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jon Merz
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Kenneth Meyer
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E Miller
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Laroy Miller
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Mohler
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Wayne Routier
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Morgenthal
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Allan Morin, Sr
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vincent Morris, II
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashid Muhammad
Represented By: Gary A Anderson
Represented By: Gregory Cade
Represented By: Kevin B McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?