Carmichael v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Carmichael
Defendant: Brown, Sgt, CO1 Hughes, CO2 Cook and Classification Officer Stevenson
Case Number: 2:2023cv00099
Filed: January 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:22-cv-01635. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT:1. The above captioned action is hereby REOPENED.2. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama.3. The Clerk of Court is directed to then CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 1/23/2023. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Filing 11 Letter to Court from Roderick Carmichael re case. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Filing 10 AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
January 19, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roderick Carmichael.(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roderick Carmichael.(aaa) Modified on 1/19/2023 (lp). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT:1. The Clerk of Court shall send Plaintiff a copy of Doc. 3 and Doc. 3-1.2. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to pay the filing fee or submit a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 12/20/2022. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 6 Letter to Court from Roderick Carmichael re case. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - More than thirty (30) days have elapsed, and Plaintiff has not submitted the filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis, nor requested an extension of time in which to do so. THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. The above captioned action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Jennifer P. Wilson on 11/23/2022. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
October 19, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from Plt. re: CO officer (pjr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
October 18, 2022 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent, #2 Instruction Sheet, #3 Fed and Local Rules, #4 398 Forms, #5 399 Form) (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sgt. Brown, CO2 Cook, CO1 Hughes, Classification Officer Stevenson lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Roderick Carmichael.(lp) Modified on 10/18/2022 (lp). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 1/23/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmichael v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown, Sgt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO1 Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO2 Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Officer Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?