Grissom v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Mark Grissom
Defendant: Annah Roberts, Hayes Webb, State of Alabama and Malia Williams
Case Number: 2:2023cv00116
Filed: January 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2023 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by State of Alabama. (Goldthwaite, Mary)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/20/23. (SAC)
March 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT: Because the parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge, the above-styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to Judge Annmarie C. Axon. Please use case number 2:23-cv-00116-ACA on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G. Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (CTF)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER On March 9, 2023, the plaintiff filed two documents, each styled as a motion to continue. (Docs. 11, 12). Although styled as motions to continue, it is clear the submissions are not motions but, rather, responses to the defendants motions to dismiss. The court DIRECTS the Clerk to TERM Documents 11 and 12 and re-docket these filings as responses to Documents 6 and 10, respectively. If the plaintiff wishes to file any additional response to the pending motions to dismiss, he MUST do so within 14 calendar days from the entry date of this order. The moving defendants SHALL file any reply in support of their motions within seven calendar days from the date on which the plaintiffs additional response is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/17/2023. (KAM)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Defendants Annah Roberts and Malia Williams have filed a motion to dismiss. (Doc. #6 ). The plaintiff, Mark Grissom, is DIRECTED to file a response to the motion to dismiss within 14 calendar days from the entry date of this order. The moving defendants SHALL file any reply within seven calendar days from the date on which the plaintiff's response is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 03/09/2023. (CTF)
March 9, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue (2nd) Motion is RIPE 3/9/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Mark Grissom. (CTF)
March 9, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Motion is RIPE 3/9/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Mark Grissom. (CTF)
March 8, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant The State of Alabama by State of Alabama. (Goldthwaite, Mary)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 21, 2023. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after April 21, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 03/08/2023. (CTF)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The plaintiff, Mark Grissom, is DIRECTED to file a response to the motion to dismiss (Doc. #6 ) within 14 calendar days from the entry date of this order. The moving defendants SHALL file any reply within seven calendar days from the date on which the plaintiffs response is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 03/08/2023. (CTF)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/12/2023; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/8/2023. (BST, )
March 7, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS/ ANSWER to #1 Complaint DENIED by Annah Roberts.(Parks, Hilary) Modified on 3/8/2023 (KAM).
February 21, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Malia Williams served on 2/16/2023, answer due 3/9/2023. (CTF)
February 17, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Annah Roberts served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. (CTF)
February 14, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Annah Roberts, State of Alabama, Hayes Webb, Malia Williams via USPS Priority Mail Express. (CTF)
January 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of case to a US magistrate judge for trial sent to plaintiff via US First Class Mail. (CTF)
January 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Annah Roberts, State of Alabama, Hayes Webb, Malia Williams, filed by Mark Grissom. (CTF)
January 27, 2023 Filing fee: $ 402.00, AALNDC receipt number B-3451, related document #1 COMPLAINT against Annah Roberts, Malia Williams, Hayes Webb, State of Alabama. (CTF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grissom v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Grissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annah Roberts
Represented By: Hilary Y Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayes Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Represented By: Mary A Goldthwaite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malia Williams
Represented By: Hilary Y Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?