Washburn v. Brown et al
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Federal National Mortgage Association
Counter Defendant: Joshua Washburn
Counter Claimant: Christopher Maurice Brown
Case Number: 2:2023cv00591
Filed: May 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. (Doc. # 7). The motion is DENIED. Within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this order, the parties SHALL file a joint report that (1) addresses whether all Defendants have been properly served and (2) proposes a briefing schedule for Pennymac's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/26/2023. (KAM)
June 22, 2023 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Joshua Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - June 13 demand)(Hood, Rhonda)
June 22, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC (Campbell, Elizabeth)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is Plaintiff's Motion to Stay #11 . The Motion #11 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Pennymac's Motion to Dismiss #10 is CONTINUED GENERALLY pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand #7 . However, Plaintiffs request that the court stay all proceedings is DENIED. The court has already continued the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) planning conference, filing a joint Rule 26(f) planning report, and commencing discovery 9 . If Plaintiff believes any additional obligations or proceedings are due to be stayed, he must identify them specifically. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/21/2023. (KAM)
June 16, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Campbell, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation of Consent to Removal and Intent to Invoke Federal Jurisdiction under 28 USC 1452(f) (Campbell, Elizabeth)
June 16, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Joy Campbell on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Campbell, Elizabeth)
June 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay re #7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court MOTION to Remand to State Court by Joshua Washburn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hood, Rhonda)
June 14, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss & Supporting Memorandum of Law by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage, #2 Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Foreclosure Deed, #4 Exhibit Special Warranty Deed)(Campbell, Elizabeth)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is Defendants' Motion to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines #8 . The Motion #8 is GRANTED. Accordingly, the deadlines for conducting a Rule 26(f) planning conference, filing a joint Rule 26(f) planning report, and commencing discovery are CONTINUED GENERALLY pending resolution of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #7 .. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/8/2023. (KAM)
June 7, 2023 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines by Defendants with Partial Consent of Plaintiff by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Campbell, Elizabeth)
June 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to Bankruptcy Court , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Joshua Washburn. (Hood, Rhonda)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - Before the court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth J. Campbell, Esq. on Behalf of Defendant Pennymac Loan Services, LLC #5 . The Motion #5 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/2/2023. (KAM)
June 1, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth J. Campbell by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Consent to Serve as Local Counsel)(Lockwood, Christopher)
June 1, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4354890. (Lockwood, Christopher) Modified on 6/2/2023 NDAL rec# B5584 (KAM).
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Unopposed/Consent Motion to Extend Time for Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint #3 . The Motion #3 is GRANTED. Defendant PennyMac Loan Services, LLC SHALL answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs amended complaint on or before June 14, 2023. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/16/2023. (KAM)
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Lockwood, Christopher)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/9/2023. (KAM)
May 9, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennymac Loan Services LLC from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 2023-79., filed by Pennymac Loan Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM)
May 8, 2023 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Christopher Maurice Brown, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Pennymac Loan Services LLC, filed by Joshua Washburn. (deemed filed 3/31/2023 in state court)(KAM)
May 8, 2023 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Joshua Washburn. (within amended complaint, deemed filed 3/31/2023 in state court)(KAM)
May 8, 2023 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Christopher Maurice Brown. (deemed filed on 5/1/2023 in state court)(KAM)
May 8, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint, and COUNTERCLAIM against Joshua Washburn by Christopher Maurice Brown. (deemed filed on 2/13/2023 in state court)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washburn v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Joshua Washburn
Represented By: Rhonda Steadman Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Christopher Maurice Brown
Represented By: Austin E James
Represented By: Carl Joseph Emmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Christopher Lea Lockwood
Represented By: Richard R Raleigh, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Joy Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Joy Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?