Sipin v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The, et al
Plaintiff: Gideon J Sipin
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The, The Bank of New York Trust Company,N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, Hometown Mortgage Services, Inc, Residential Funding, Inc and Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv00605
Filed: May 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Mancuso, Allyson)
June 21, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 Defendants BNYM and MERS' MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Gideon J Sipin. (CTF)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The plaintiff has filed a motion seeking an extension of an unspecified duration to respond to the pending motion to dismiss. (Doc. #12 ). The motion is GRANTED to the extent the plaintiff is afforded an additional 14 calendar days from the entry date of this order to file a response to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/12/2023. (CTF)
June 6, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss #5 filed by Gideon J Sipin. (CTF)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., have filed a motion to stay discovery and the parties' obligations under Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure pending disposition of their motion to dismiss. (Doc. #9 ). The motion to stay is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/6/2023. (CTF)
June 5, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING by Gideon J Sipin. (CTF)
June 2, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Deadlines and Discovery by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A, Proposed Order)(Mancuso, Allyson)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., have filed a motion to dismiss. (Doc. #5 ). The plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a response to the motion within 14 calendar days from the entry date of this order. The moving defendants SHALL file any reply within seven calendar days from the date on which the plaintiff's response is due. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/2/2023. (CTF)
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than July 17, 2023. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a district judge without further order after July 17. 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/2/2023. (BST, )
June 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/7/2023; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/2/2023. (BST, )
June 1, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, Assignment of Mortgage)(Mancuso, Allyson)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., have filed a motion seeking a two-week extension of time until June 1, 2023, to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #3 ). The motion is GRANTED. The moving defendants SHALL respond to the complaint on or before June 1, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/22/2023. (CTF)
May 17, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4344010, B-5339. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The from Circuit Court of Shelby County, AL, case number 58-CV-2023-147., filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(AKD). (Manley, Reid) Modified on 5/17/2023 (CTF).
May 15, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Motion is RIPE 5/15/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The. (Mancuso, Allyson)
May 11, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
May 11, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The; Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., from Circuit Court of Shelby County, AL, case number 58-CV-2023-147., filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(AKD)
May 11, 2023 State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Shelby County on 4/11/2023. (AKD,
May 11, 2023 MOTION to Dismiss Foreclosure Sale filed in Shelby County Circuit Court on 4/20/2023 (Exibit A Part 2 of 2 page 19) by Gideon J Sipin. (AKD) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sipin v. Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company N.A., The
Represented By: Allyson R Mancuso
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Trust Company,N.A.
Represented By: Allyson R Mancuso
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Represented By: Allyson R Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hometown Mortgage Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Funding, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gideon J Sipin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?