Boggan et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Larry Boggan, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe, Bridgett Thompson and James Grier
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00774
Filed: June 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER transferring case to the District of Massachusetts; Record will be electronically transferred to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 8/25/2023. (KAM)
August 24, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue Second Supplement by Ford Motor Company. (Malek, Paul)
August 23, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE by Larry Boggan, James Grier, Bridgett Thompson, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe Plaintiffs' Notice Re Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion to Transfer Venue (Miceli, David)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 unopposed motion for extension of time for Ford to respond to the complaint and motion for stay. Ford asserts that its venue motion is unopposed. (Doc. #15 ). Within three days, counsel for the plaintiffs shall file a notice indicating whether Ford's venue motion is unopposed. The Clerk shall please TERM Docs. 16 and 17. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on August 21, 2023. (Haikala, Madeline)
August 18, 2023 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue Supplement to Motion by Ford Motor Company. (Malek, Paul)
August 18, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Malek, Paul)
August 14, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #15 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Malek, Paul)
August 14, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Malek, Paul)
August 14, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Allen Sydnor, Jr on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Sydnor, James)
August 14, 2023 Filing 13 Evidentiary Material in Support of Ford Motor Company's Unopposed Motion to Transfer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Malek, Paul)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 HAIKALA CHAMBERS INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/20/2023. (DNW)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS #3 MOTION for Limited Admission, #9 MOTION for Limited Admission, #10 MOTION for Limited Admission, #2 MOTION for Limited Admission, #8 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory F. Coleman. Attorney Gregory F Coleman,Mitchell M. Breit,Tyler A. Litke, Leland Belew and Virginia A. Whitener are admitted as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 7/5/2023. (DNW)
July 5, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler A. Litke by Larry Boggan, James Grier, Bridgett Thompson, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler A Litke ISO Motion for Admission PHV)(Miceli, David)
July 5, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchell M. Breit by Larry Boggan, James Grier, Bridgett Thompson, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitchell M Breit ISO Motion for Admission PHV)(Miceli, David)
July 5, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory F. Coleman by Larry Boggan, James Grier, Bridgett Thompson, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory F Coleman ISO Motion for Admission PHV)(Miceli, David)
July 5, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4376133 (B-6112). (Miceli, David) Modified on 7/5/2023 (DNW).
July 5, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4376113 (rcpt no. B-6111). (Miceli, David) Modified on 7/5/2023 (DNW).
July 5, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4376088 (rcpt no. B-6110). (Miceli, David) Modified on 7/5/2023 (DNW).
June 27, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Larry Boggan, Brian Wolfe, Bridgett Thompson, James Grier, Kelly Wolfe. Ford Motor Company waiver sent on 6/20/2023, answer due 8/19/2023. (Miceli, David)
June 26, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. Returned to plaintiff for service. (DNW)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS #4 MOTION for Limited Admission - Ryan P. McMillan. Attorney Ryan P McMillan is admitted as counsel for plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/22/2023. (DNW)
June 20, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Limited Admission - Ryan P. McMillan by Larry Boggan, Bridgett Thompson, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan P. McMillan in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Miceli, David)
June 20, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4366361 (rcpt. no B-5912). (Miceli, David) Modified on 6/21/2023 (DNW).
June 16, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Limited Admission - Virginia A. Whitener by Larry Boggan, James Grier, Bridgett Thompson, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Virginia A. Whitener in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Miceli, David)
June 16, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Limited Admission - Leland Belew by Larry Boggan, James Grier, Bridgett Thompson, Brian Wolfe, Kelly Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Leland Belew in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Miceli, David)
June 16, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4365077. ALND receipt number B-5871. (Miceli, David)
June 16, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4365024> ALND receiptnumber B-5869. (Miceli, David)
June 15, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4364161 (rcpt. no. B-5854). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company filed by Larry Boggan, Brian Wolfe, Bridgett Thompson, James Grier, Kelly Wolfe.(DNW). (Miceli, David) Modified on 6/15/2023 (DNW).
June 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company filed by Larry Boggan, Brian Wolfe, Bridgett Thompson, James Grier, Kelly Wolfe.(DNW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boggan et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Boggan
Represented By: David F Miceli
Represented By: Ryan P McMillan
Represented By: Leland Belew
Represented By: Virginia Ann Whitener
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Tyler A. Litke
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wolfe
Represented By: David F Miceli
Represented By: Ryan P McMillan
Represented By: Leland Belew
Represented By: Virginia Ann Whitener
Represented By: Tyler A. Litke
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Wolfe
Represented By: David F Miceli
Represented By: Ryan P McMillan
Represented By: Virginia Ann Whitener
Represented By: Leland Belew
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Tyler A. Litke
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgett Thompson
Represented By: David F Miceli
Represented By: Ryan P McMillan
Represented By: Virginia Ann Whitener
Represented By: Leland Belew
Represented By: Tyler A. Litke
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grier
Represented By: David F Miceli
Represented By: Ryan P McMillan
Represented By: Virginia Ann Whitener
Represented By: Leland Belew
Represented By: Gregory F Coleman
Represented By: Mitchell M. Breit
Represented By: Tyler A. Litke
Represented By: Leland Humphrey Belew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: James Allen Sydnor, Jr
Represented By: Paul F Malek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?