Chappell v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Laura Ann Chappell
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 2:2023cv01144
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BRIEFING letter to counsel. Responses due by 11/25/2023 (KAM)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner. (Attachments: #1 Certification Page, #2 Court Transcript Index, #3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, #4 Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 Non Disability Related Development, #7 Disability Related Development, #8 Medical Records)(Holzberger, Malia)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Malia Lawson Holzberger on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Holzberger, Malia)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 9/5/2023. (MEB2)
August 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Choi on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Choi, Sarah)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B Hood on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Hood, Jack)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE counsel is required to provide the plaintiff's social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the electronic filing system. (RMM)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Social Security Answer Deadline by Laura Ann Chappell. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 8/30/2023, answer due 10/29/2023. (RMM)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Laura Ann Chappell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(RMM) Modified on 8/30/2023 (RMM).
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Laura Ann Chappell.(RMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chappell v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ann Chappell
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: Jack B Hood
Represented By: Malia Lawson Holzberger
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?