Lockley v. Zimmer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Archie Lockley
Defendant: Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc and Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01553
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER Before the court is the parties' Joint Motion for Permission to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference Remotely. #17 . The Motion #17 is GRANTED. On or before January 22, 2024, pursuant to the Initial Order #13 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26, the parties SHALL meet and confer via video conference call. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/4/2024. (KAM)
January 4, 2024 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Permission to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference Remotely by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc. (Mathis, Alan)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER - Before the court are Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice seeking the admission of attorneys Blake T. Lehr #14 and Eldin Hasic #15 . The Motions #14 #15 are hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/28/2023. (KAM)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eldin Hasic by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Eldin Hasic, #2 Certification of Eldin Hasic)(Mathis, Alan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Blake T. Lehr by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Blake T. Lehr, #2 Certification of Blake L. Lehr)(Mathis, Alan)
December 22, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4495799. (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 12/27/2023.NDAL rec# B-9226 (KAM).
December 22, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4495805. (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 12/27/2023. ALND Rec# B-9227 (KAM).
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/21/2023. (DNW)
December 21, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT-Because the parties have not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable R. David Proctor. Please use case number 2:23 CV 1553 RDP on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius no longer assigned to the case. (AKD)
December 21, 2023 Telephone Conference set for January 4, 2024 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER-Pursuant to the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than January 22, 2024. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after January 22, 2024.A telephone status conference is SET for 11:00 a.m. on January 4, 2024. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-336-1831 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 2778178. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if forms from all parties are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/13/2023. (AKD)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2024; Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/13/2023. (BST, )
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Zimmer Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc.(Mathis, Alan)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER;The defendants' unopposed motion seeking an extension of the deadline to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. (Doc. #7 ). The defendants SHALL file a responsive pleading by December 6, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 11/27/2023. (AKD)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Zimmer's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 11/21/2023. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc. (Mathis, Alan)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Completed Exhibit B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Mathis, Alan)
November 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
November 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc (AKD)
November 15, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc (AKD)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Zimmer Inc (AKD)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-903573.00., filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AKD)
November 15, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4470402 (ALND receipt# B-8539). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-CV-2023-903573.00., filed by Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc, Zimmer Inc, Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AKD). (Mathis, Alan) Modified on 11/15/2023 (AKD).
November 15, 2023 State Court Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 10/06/2023. (AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lockley v. Zimmer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Lockley
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Represented By: Xan Ingram Flowers
Represented By: Eldin Hasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings Inc
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Represented By: Xan Ingram Flowers
Represented By: Eldin Hasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Orthopedic Surgical Products Inc
Represented By: Xan Ingram Flowers
Represented By: Alan D Mathis
Represented By: Eldin Hasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?